Dixon v. Allison et al
Plaintiff: Rick Dixon
Defendant: Kathleen Allison, T. Wan, F. Vasquez and Matthew Cate
Case Number: 1:2010cv02365
Filed: December 20, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Close Case Pursuant to Parties' Stipulation for Voluntary Dismissal, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/22/18. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Post-Screening ADR and STAYING CASE for 120 Days signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/16/2017. Settlement Conference set for 3/7/2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Sant Agata, S)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER ADOPTING 46 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 09/27/2017. (Flores, E)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Granting in Part Defendant's 36 Motion to Dismiss signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 08/02/2017. Referred to Judge Drozd. (Flores, E)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER DENYING Defendant's Motion for Relief from Local Rule 230(1), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/22/2016. (Martin-Gill, S)
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING Motion for Leave to Amend and ORDER Directing Clerk to File Third Amended Complaint 23 Lodged on October 9, 2014, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 11/10/2014. (Jessen, A)
October 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER VACATING 4 Order of December 27, 2010, Which Granted Plaintiff Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and Directed the CDCR to Make Payments for Filing Fee; ORDER for Clerk to Serve Copies of This Order on the CDCR and the Court's Financial Department, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/2/2013. (Marrujo, C)
January 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DENYING 5 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 1/14/2011. (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dixon v. Allison et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Wan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. Vasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Cate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?