United States of America v. Approximately $7,562.00 in U.S. Currency et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Approximately $7,562.00 in U.S. Currency, 1972 Oldsmobile 442, No License Plate, 1965 Ford Mustang, No License Plate, 2008 Chevrolet Malibu, License: 6LFA733, 2006 Lexus GS300, License: 5MJJ752, 1969 Chevrolet Truck, No License Plate, 1962 Chevrolet Impala, No License Plate, 1976 Harley Davidson Motorcycle, License: 15U3097, 1965 Ford Mustang, License: CZW446, 2007 Pontiac G6, License: 6HQG262, 2008 Pontiac G6, License: 6LTN600 and 2007 Chevrolet Truck, License: 8K96671
Case Number: 1:2010mc00044
Filed: October 14, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 881
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DISMISSING CASE signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/12/2011. CASE CLOSED. See 1:11-cv-1110-AWI-SKO.(Lundstrom, T)
April 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 THIRD STIPULATION And ORDER Extending The United States' Time To File A Complaint For Forfeiture And/Or To Obtain An Indictment Alleging Forfeiture, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/6/2011. (Fahrney, E)
January 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SECOND Stipulation and ORDER extending the United States' time to file a complaint for forfeiture and/or to obtain an Indictment alleging forfeiture signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/7/2011. Deadline extended to 4/6/2011. (Figueroa, O)
October 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STIPULATION and ORDER EXTENDING the United States' Time to File a Complaint for Forfeiture and/or to Obtain an Indictment Alleging Forfeiture, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/15/2010. Deadline Extended to 1/6/2011. (Jessen, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Approximately $7,562.00 in U.S. Currency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Deanna Lynne Martinez, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $7,562.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1972 Oldsmobile 442, No License Plate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1965 Ford Mustang, No License Plate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2008 Chevrolet Malibu, License: 6LFA733
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2006 Lexus GS300, License: 5MJJ752
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1969 Chevrolet Truck, No License Plate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1962 Chevrolet Impala, No License Plate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1976 Harley Davidson Motorcycle, License: 15U3097
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1965 Ford Mustang, License: CZW446
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2007 Pontiac G6, License: 6HQG262
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2008 Pontiac G6, License: 6LTN600
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2007 Chevrolet Truck, License: 8K96671
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?