Hernandez v. Bank of America, Countrywide
Plaintiff: Maricela Verde Hernandez
Defendant: Bank of America, Countrywide
Case Number: 1:2011cv00001
Filed: January 4, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Presiding Judge: Oliver W. Wanger
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1601
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING BAC's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings/Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 5/23/2011. (Figueroa, O)
May 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting 8 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 5/11/2011. (Lundstrom, T)
April 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Directing Plaintiff's Counsel to Serve this Order on Plaintiff and GRANTING Additional Time to File Opposition of Notice of Opposition, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 4/1/2011. (Kusamura, W)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez v. Bank of America, Countrywide
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maricela Verde Hernandez
Represented By: Emeka Godfrey Onwualu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, Countrywide
Represented By: Keith D. Klein
Represented By: Sarah Samuelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?