Vaught v. Allison et al
Plaintiff: Elbert Lee Vaught, IV
Defendant: Akin, K. Santoro, P. Denny, R. Hall, R. Gomez and Kathleen Allison
Case Number: 1:2011cv00067
Filed: December 17, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Gerald B. Cohn
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE for Failure to Comply With the Court's May 11, 2011, Screening Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald B. Cohn on 6/20/2011. Plaintiff must show cause OR file an amended complaint by 8/1/2011. (Jessen, A)
May 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DISMISSING 8 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND, signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald B. Cohn on 5/11/2011. Second Amended Complaint due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
January 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER to Submit Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis OR Pay Filing Fee Within 45 Day, signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald B. Cohn on 1/19/11. (Attachments: # 1 Applicaiton for IFP)(Hellings, J)
January 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:10-cv-3369 DAD) to Fresno (1:11-cv-0067 GBC) signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/12/11. (Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vaught v. Allison et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Akin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Santoro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Denny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elbert Lee Vaught, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?