Lopez v. Yates, et al.
Plaintiff: Emiliano Lopez
Defendant: L. Mackin, James A. Yates, L. Wilson and P. Tuman
Case Number: 1:2011cv00107
Filed: January 21, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Gerald B. Cohn
Presiding Judge: Oliver W. Wanger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER REGARDING In Forma Pauperis Status on Appeal 43 , signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 12/11/13. (cc via electronic service: USCA)(Hellings, J)
October 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Dismissal of 34 Action signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 10/17/2013. Referred to Judge O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 11/21/2013. (Flores, E)
February 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 2/26/2013 vacating 26 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; denying 32 Motion for Extension of Time as moot and directing Clerk to file Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint attached to the February 25, 2013, request for an extension of time (pages 6-16), as a separate document. (Lundstrom, T)
December 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Granting 27 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Second Amended Complaint and to File Objections to Findings and Recommendations, signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald B. Cohn on 12/27/12. Thirty Day Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
December 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Dismissal of 10 Action, with Prejudice, for Failure to State a Claim Upon which Relief may be Granted and for Failure to Prosecute; Objections Due within 14 Days signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald B. Cohn on 12/17/2012. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O' Neill. Objections to F&R due by 1/3/2013. (Sant Agata, S)
September 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION Recommending Dismissal of Plaintiff's Action with Prejudice for Failure to State a Claim 10 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald B. Cohn on 8/31/11. Referred to Judge Wanger. (Verduzco, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez v. Yates, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Mackin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James A. Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Tuman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emiliano Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?