Sanders v. MAGEC Metro Tatical Team et al
Plaintiff: Phillip Sanders
Defendant: Ciummo And Associates Employer, Ko Jo Howard, T. Asami, Jamy Geurro, ADO Law Firm Employer, MAGEC Metro Tatical Team, County of Fresno Employers, T. Gelbert, Fresno Police Department, City of Fresno Employers, Fresno County Sheriff Department, S. Karsainsin, Doug Haas, Fresno County DA Department, Christopher Irwin, Charlotte Zylka, Cynthia Kathryn, Curtis Sok, Fresno Public Defenders Office and Richard Esquevel
Case Number: 1:2011cv00184
Filed: February 9, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Plaintiff's Complaint be Dismissed re 1 filed by Phillip Sanders. Motion to Dismiss is referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 2/29/2012 signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 2/14/2012. (Yu, L)
January 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER STRIKING MISCELLANEOUS MOTIONS AND AMENDED COMPLAINT 23 21 15 and DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE AMENDED STATUS REPORT, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 1/9/2012. (Yu, L)
October 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 16 Motion To Obtain Montetary Sancitons, Remove Consolidated Case to Fresno County Superior Court and Remove the Stay Pending the Resolution of Plaintiff's Criminal Proceedings signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 10/24/2011. (Yu, L)
September 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE WHY A STATUS REPORT HAS NOT BEEN FILED AND WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE ISSUED FOR PLAINTIFFS FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH A COURT ORDER. Show Cause Response due by 10/6/2011 signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 09/19/2011. (Yu, L)
May 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER VACATING Hearing of May 27, 2011, ORDER on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, and ORDER on Defendant's Motion to CONSOLIDATE and STAY Action, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/25/11. (Hellings, J)
April 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Staying Case Pending Resolution of State Court Criminal Proceedings. Plaintiff to file a Status Update on June 30, 2011 and every 90 days thereafter. signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 4/1/2011. (Yu, L)
March 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING 4 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 3/4/2011. (Yu, L)
February 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DENYING Without Prejudice Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis 2 ; Clerk to Send Plaintiff IFP Form; Plaintiff to Fully and Completely Fill Out Form and Return to The Court Not Later Than March 15, 2011, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 2/15/11. (Attachments: # 1 Blank IFP Form)(Hellings, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanders v. MAGEC Metro Tatical Team et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ciummo And Associates Employer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ko Jo Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Asami
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamy Geurro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADO Law Firm Employer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAGEC Metro Tatical Team
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Fresno Employers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Gelbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fresno Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Fresno Employers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fresno County Sheriff Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Karsainsin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Haas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fresno County DA Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Irwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlotte Zylka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Kathryn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis Sok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fresno Public Defenders Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Esquevel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?