Meadows v. Reeves, et al.
Plaintiff: Michann Meadows
Defendant: Dr. Reeves, Central California Women's Facility Medical Department, Heyne and O. Okereke
Case Number: 1:2011cv00257
Filed: February 14, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Madera
Presiding Judge: Gerald B. Cohn
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION with Prejudice for Stipulation and DISCHARGING Order to Show Cause 16 and 168 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/4/17. CASE CLOSED (Martin-Gill, S)
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER to the Parties and Counsel to SHOW CAUSE why Sanctions Should not be imposed for their failure to comply with the Court's Order,signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/02/2017. Show Cause Response due (14-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER VACATING Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum Directing the Production of Plaintiff for Trial on April 25, 2017 at 8:30 A.M. 150 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/30/17. (Hellings, J)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER After Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/29/17: Joint Statement Re Status of Settlement due June 29, 2017. (Hellings, J)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER that Inmate Michann Meadows, CDC #W-52504, is No Longer Needed as a Witness in these Proceedings, and the Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum is Discharged, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/28/2017. (Hall, S)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER on Plaintiff's Motion to Amend 127 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/24/17: Motion is DENIED. (Hellings, J)
March 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER & WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Michann Meadows, CDC#W-52504 for Jury Trial before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston, at the U. S. District Court, 510 19th Street, Suite 200, Bakersfield, CA 93301, on Tuesday, April 25, 2017 at 8:30 a.m., signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/14/17. (Gonzalez, R)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER & WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Michann Meadows, CDCR #W-52504, before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston, at the U. S. District Court, 510 19th Street, Suite 200, Bakersfield, CA 93301, on March 28, 2017 at 1:30 p.m., signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/7/17. (Gonzalez, R)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER After Informal Telephonic Conference 133 ; Order re: Request to Seal 131 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 02/14/17. (Martin-Gill, S)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER After Telephonic Conference Re: Discovery Dispute, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/18/17. (Hellings, J)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER GRANTING Stipulation to Amend Pretrial Deadlines, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/17/2017. (Hellings, J)
December 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER After In Camera Review, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/29/2016. (Marrujo, C)
December 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER AFTER Telephonic Conference re: Discovery Dispute, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/28/16. (Marrujo, C)
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER GRANTING Second Stipulation to Amend Pretrial Deadlines 115 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/17/16: Plaintiff's Pretrial Statement due 1/25/2017, Defendant's Pretrial Statement due 2/23/2017; Plaintiff's Motion for Attendance of Incarcerated Witnesses due 3/9/2017, Defendant(s)' Objections due 4/6/2017. (Hellings, J)
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER Granting Stipulation re Pretrial Deadlines 110 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/7/16. Pretrial Conference set for 1/18/2017 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston; Jury Trial set for 3/6/2017 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield at 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Verduzco, M)
September 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER Granting 102 Stipulated Protective Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/6/16. (Gonzalez, R)
August 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER Granting Leave for Further Discovery and Setting Trial signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 08/08/2016. Jury Trial set for 3/28/2017 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. Telephonic Trial Confirmation Hearing set for 1/6/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston.(Flores, E)
July 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER After Settlement Conference to File Joint Status Report, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/30/16. Deadline: 8/1/2016. (Gonzalez, R)
May 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER & WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Michann Meadows, CDCR #W-52504, Plaintiff on June 30, 2016 at 10:00a.m., signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/26/16. (Gonzalez, R)
May 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER Approving Stipulation to Continue Settlement Conference 89 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/17/16: New date for Settlement Conference set for 6/30/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean; Confidential Settlement Conference Statements due 6/17/2016. (Hellings, J)
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER Vacating Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum 86 Directing the Production of Plaintiff for Settlement Conference on May 18, 2016, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/11/16. (Verduzco, M)
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER APPOINTING LIMITED PURPOSE COUNSEL FOR PURPOSES OF SETTLEMENT signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/18/2016. (Lundstrom, T)
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER & WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Michann Meadows, CDCR #W-52504, for Settlement Conference on May 18, 2016 at 10:00 a.m., signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 04/12/2016.(Flores, E)
March 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER Setting Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/17/16. Settlement Conference set for 5/18/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Gonzalez, R)
March 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER Adopting Findings and Recommendation 83 ; and Denying Motion for Summary Judgment 74 , signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/7/16. (Verduzco, M)
December 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 83 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Deny Defendant's 74 Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/30/15. Objections to F&R Due Within Thirty Days. (Marrujo, C)
May 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 75 AMENDED SECOND INFORMATIONAL ORDER - Notice and Warning of Requirements for Opposing Defendant's motion for Summary Judgment 74 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/15/15. (Verduzco, M)
May 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER GRANTING Defendant's Motion to Modify Scheduling Order 72 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/7/15: Dispositive Motion Deadline EXTENDED to 5/14/2015. (Hellings, J)
March 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motions for Appointment of an Expert Witness 65 & 69 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/10/2015. (Marrujo, C)
January 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 68 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/27/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
October 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER Denying 63 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/08/2014. (Flores, E)
July 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion For Appointment Of Counsel (Doc. 55 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/9/2014. (Fahrney, E)
April 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER DISCHARGING 47 Order to Show Cause and DIRECTING U.S. Marshal to Serve Defendant signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 4/15/2014. (Sant Agata, S)
March 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why this Matter should not be Dismissed; Response Required within Thirty (30) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 3/26/2014. (Sant Agata, S)
August 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER DISMISSING Uncognizable Claims and Defendants; ORDER DENYING Motion to Open Discovery, for Evidentiary Hearing, for Negotiation Hearing and for Appointment of Counsel re 41 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 8/8/2013. Defendants O. Okereke, Central California Women's Facility Medical Department and Heyne (CMO) terminated. (Jessen, A)
June 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motions for Appointment of Counsel 34 , 35 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 6/2/13: Motions DENIED without prejudice. (Hellings, J)
November 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 11/26/2012 ORDERING plaintiff's attorney's request for authority to incur costs by appointed pro bono counsel Jenny Huang is GRANTED. (Crouch, J)
October 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 9/13/2012 ORDERING plaintiff's attorney's request for authority to incur costs by appointed pro bono counsel Jenny Huang is GRANTED. (Crouch, J)
October 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Regarding Service of the Second Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 10/9/12. 20-Day Deadline. (Verduzco, M)
August 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 8/21/2012 ORDERING plaintiff's attorney's request for authority to incur costs by appointed pro bono counsel Jenny Huang is GRANTED. (Crouch, J)
July 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER DENYING 20 Motion to Appoint Counsel as MOOT signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 7/10/2012. (Sant Agata, S)
May 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER APPOINTING Limited Purpose Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 5/30/2012. (Sant Agata, S)
May 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DISMISSING 14 Action, with Prejudice, for Failure to State a Claim upon which Relief may be Granted signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald B. Cohn on 5/4/2012. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
February 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DENYING Motion for Appointment of Counsel 3 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald B. Cohn on 2/18/11. (Hellings, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meadows v. Reeves, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michann Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central California Women's Facility Medical Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heyne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O. Okereke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?