Price v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Winston Price
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2011cv00377
Filed: March 3, 2011
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Presiding Judge: Oliver W. Wanger
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Directing Judgment in Favor of the Defendant Commissioner of Social Security and Against Plaintiff Winston Price, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/17/2012. Referred to Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Objections to F&R due by 7/31/2012.(Hall, S)
December 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING SECOND EXTENSION OF TIME signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/13/2011. Filing Deadline: 1/11/2011. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
June 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting Extension of Time signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/23/2011. (Filing Deadline: 8/22/2011) (Leon-Guerrero, A)
March 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting 3 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 03/04/2011. (Flores, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Price v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Winston Price
Represented By: Sengthiene Bosavanh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Brenda Pullin, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?