Morales v. Stephen Investments, Inc. et al.
Plaintiff: John Morales
Defendant: Vilavan Sayaseng and Stephen Investments, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2011cv00484
Filed: March 21, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION and ORDER DISMISSING CASE signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/12/2011. CASE CLOSED.(Lundstrom, T)
June 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re Dispositive Documents After Notice of Settlement 12 - plaintiff notified the Court, case has SETTLED. All dates VACATED, including Scheduling Conference hearing of 6/27/2011 before Judge Snyder. Dispositive documents will be submitted no later than 7/13/2011. signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 6//20/2011. (Herman, H)
May 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION to Continue Mandatory Scheduling Conference; ORDER - Initial SCHEDULING CONFERENCE is continued from 6/8/2011 to Monday, June 27, 2011 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SMS) before Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder. signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 5/31/2011. (Herman, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morales v. Stephen Investments, Inc. et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vilavan Sayaseng
Represented By: Wesley Joseph Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Investments, Inc.
Represented By: Wesley Joseph Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Morales
Represented By: Tanya Levinson Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?