Olvera v. City of Modesto et al
Plaintiff: Armando Olvera
Defendant: Bradley Beavers, Mark Ulrich, City of Modesto, Brian Kleiber, Randy Raduechel, Tim Helton and Modesto Police Department
Case Number: 1:2011cv00540
Filed: March 31, 2011
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Stanislaus
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 67 STIPULATION and ORDER for DISMISSAL OF ALL CLAIMS, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/28/2015. CASE CLOSED (Martin-Gill, S)
July 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER Regarding Settlement Conference Procedures signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/30/2015. (Martinez, A)
February 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion for Reinstatement of Civil Code Section 52.1 Claim (Doc. 51 ), Signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/12/2015. (Arellano, S.)
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER vacating hearing date of 9/8/14 signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/4/14. (Nazaroff, H)
August 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER ; granting in part and denying in part 23 Motion for Summary Judgment 1. Defendants motion for summary judgment is GRANTED on Plaintiffs Section 1983 claims based on the Fourteenth Amendment, and based on the Fourth Amendment prohibition of unreasonable searches;2. Defendants motion for summary judgment is GRANTED on Plaintiffs Cal. Civ. Code section 3342 claim; and3. Defendants motion for summary judgment is DENIED ON ALL OTHER CLAIMS signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/6/14. (Nazaroff, H)
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER, VACATING Pretrial Conference set for October 10, 2013 and Jury Trial set for November 12, 2013 and Instead, Setting a Case Management Conference/Trial Setting Conference Shortly After the Issuance of the Court's Ruling on the Defendants' Pending Motion, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 09/28/13. (Martin-Gill, S)
April 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER VACATING April 29, 2013 Hearing Date and Taking Matter Under Submission, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/25/2013. (Kusamura, W)
April 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Order VACATING and resetting jury trial, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 04/23/2013. (Jury Trial currently set for 7/23/2013 has been CONTINUED to 11/12/2013 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii) (Figueroa, O)
March 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION and ORDER RESETTING Hearing Date on Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Docs. 23 , 24 ), Signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/19/2013. The Motion Hearing currently set for 4/15/2013 is RESET to 4/29/2013 at 01:30 PM in Ctrm. 2 before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Arellano, S.)
January 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION and ORDER for Dismissal of Action of All Claims Against Defendants Bradley Beavers, Brian Kleiber, Randy Raduechel and Timothy Helton and Certain Claims Against Defendants City of Modesto, Modesto Police Department and Mark Ulrich, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/24/13. Brian Kleiber, Randy Raduechel, Bradley Beavers and Tim Helton terminated. (Gonzalez, R)
September 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATED Request for an Amended Scheduling Order; ORDER Thereon signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/4/2012. Non-Expert Discovery due by 10/3/2012; Expert Disclosure due by 11/5/2012; Supplemental Expert Disclosure due by 12/4/2012; E xpert Discovery due by 1/11/2013; Non-Dispositive Motions filed by 2/8/2013; Dispositive Motions filed by 3/8/2013; Pretrial Conference set for 5/30/2013 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii; Jury Trial set for 7/23/2013 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii.(Bradley, A)
April 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Stipulated Request for an Amended Scheduling Order; ORDER Thereon signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/10/2012. Deadlines extended as follows: Non-Expert Discovery due by 8/3/2012; Expert Disclosure due by 9/4/2012; Supplemental Expert Disclosure due by 10/4/2012; Expert Discovery due by 11/8/2012; Non-Dispositive Motions filed by 12/7/2012; Dispositive Motions filed by 1/11/2013. (Bradley, A)
February 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATED Request to Vacate Trial Date and For a New Scheduling Order; ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/9/2012. Non-Expert Discovery due by 5/18/2012; Expert Disclosures due by 6/18/2012; Supplemental Expert Disclosures due b y 7/16/2012; Expert Discovery due by 8/13/2012; Non-Dispositive Motions filed by 8/20/2012; Dispositive Motions filed by 9/24/2012; Pretrial Conference set for 3/21/2013 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii; Jury Trial set for 5/14/2013 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii.. (Bradley, A)
September 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Stipulation and ORDER to Protect Confidential Information signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/1/2011. (Bradley, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Olvera v. City of Modesto et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley Beavers
Represented By: James Francis Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Ulrich
Represented By: James Francis Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Modesto
Represented By: James Francis Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Kleiber
Represented By: James Francis Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Raduechel
Represented By: James Francis Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Helton
Represented By: James Francis Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Modesto Police Department
Represented By: James Francis Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Armando Olvera
Represented By: Alonzo Jarvis Gradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?