Rios v. Warden of CSP-Corcoran
Petitioner: Reno Fuentes Rios
Respondent: Warden of CSP-Corcoran
Case Number: 1:2011cv00667
Filed: April 27, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Dismiss Claims Consistent with Magistrate Judge's Prior Order in Light of Williams Decision and Dismiss 45 Amended Complaint without Leave to Amend signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 05/31/2018. Referred to Judge O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 6/25/2018.(Flores, E)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER DENYING Motion for Leave to Amend Ex Post Facto Claim and to Conduct an Evidentiary Hearing; ORDER DENYING Request for Appointment of Counsel; ORDER GRANTING Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint re 43 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 9/21/17. Thirty Day Deadline. (Marrujo, C)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER DISCHARGING 38 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/15/2017. (Jessen, A)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER for Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE Why Claims should not be Dismissed because Plaintiff was not given Leave to File them and because the Statute of Limitations has Run; Show Cause Response due within Thirty Days signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/1/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Convert Case to Civil Rights Action Pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 1983, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/21/17. (Hellings, J)
December 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Directing Clerk's Office to Re-Serve Order 21 and to Send Petitioner Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis and Civil Rights Complaint Form; ORDER Granting Petitioner Leave to Amend the Petition and Assert Claims under 42 USC 1983 (60-Day Deadline); ORDER Directing Petitioner to File Updated Address (30-Day Deadline), signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/12/16. (Verduzco, M)
November 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CJA 20 Appointment of and Authority to Pay Court Appointed Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 11/2/11. Attorney Benjamin P. Ramos for Reno Fuentes Rios added. (Gonzalez, R)
June 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DISMISSING Petition For Writ Of Habeas Corpus, ORDER Directing Clerk Of Court To Enter Judgment, ORDER Declining Issuance Of Certificate Of Appealability, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/7/2011. CASE CLOSED.(Fahrney, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rios v. Warden of CSP-Corcoran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Reno Fuentes Rios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden of CSP-Corcoran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?