Le v. Youngblood et al
Petitioner: Nguyen Le
Respondent: Donny Youngblood, Eric H. Holder, Jr., Janet Napolitano and Timothy S. Aitken
Case Number: 1:2011cv00668
Filed: April 26, 2011
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION and ORDER to DISMISS 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus as MOOT; NO CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY REQUIRED signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/10/2011. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
May 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DENYING 12 Petitioner's Motion to Expedite Proceedings signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/26/2011. (Jessen, A)
May 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why the Petition Should Not be Granted; ORDER Directing the Clerk to Serve Documents on Respondent, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/4/11. (Verduzco, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Le v. Youngblood et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Donny Youngblood
Represented By: Audrey Benison Hemesath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Eric H. Holder, Jr.
Represented By: Audrey Benison Hemesath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Janet Napolitano
Represented By: Audrey Benison Hemesath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Timothy S. Aitken
Represented By: Audrey Benison Hemesath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Nguyen Le
Represented By: Michael Chinh Vu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?