Butler v. Onyejie et al
Plaintiff: Perry C Butler
Defendant: O Onyejie, T. Byers and Le May
Case Number: 1:2011cv00723
Filed: May 5, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER denying 88 Motion requesting Court Issue an Order on the Motion to Vacate signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 10/23/25015. (Lundstrom, T)
April 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER DISMISSING Action for Failure to Obey a Court Order 83 , signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 4/4/14: Clerk Shall Close Case. (CASE CLOSED)(Hellings, J)
March 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER denying 80 Motion for Reconsideration signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 3/30/2014. (Lundstrom, T)
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE WHY CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH COURT ORDER (ECF No. 78, 79, and 81), Show Cause Response within 14 days, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 03/14/2014. (Yu, L)
January 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER DENYING (1) 37 43 Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment; (2)Plaintiff's 48 Motion to Strike Expert Barnett's Declaration; (3) Plaintiff's 47 Motion for Simultaneous Interpretation Equipment; (4) Defendant's 62 [ 63] Motions to Strike Plaintiff's Declarations and Exhibits; (5) Plaintiff's 67 Motion for Extension of Time; and (6) Plaintiff's 76 Motion/Notice of Correct Address signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 1/22/2014. (Sant Agata, S)
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER Partially Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Compel and Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions 34 , signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 9/30/13. (Verduzco, M)
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER ; Granting Defendant's 51 Motion for Extension of Time to Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 5/15/2013. (Yu, L)
March 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Designate Action as Regular Pro Se Action and REASSIGNING Action to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 3/8/2013. (Marrujo, C)
February 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER ADOPTING 21 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS IN FULL and ORDER DISMISSING Claims Against Defendant T. Byers, LVN Le May and Doe Defendant LVN, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/4/2012. (Jessen, A)
December 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Dismissal of Certain Claims 16 , 20 , signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 12/13/11. Referred to Judge Ishii. Objections, If Any, Due Within Twenty-One Days. (Gonzalez, R)
November 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER denying 15 Motion for U.S. Marshal to serve first amended complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 11/3/2011. (Lundstrom, T)
May 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to REDESIGNATE Action as Prisoner Civil Rights Action signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 5/9/2011. The new case number is 1:11-cv-00723-AWI-DLB (PC). (Sant Agata, S)
May 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INFORMATIONAL ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 5/6/2011. (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Butler v. Onyejie et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perry C Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O Onyejie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Byers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Le May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?