Hanford Executive Management Employee Association et al v. City of Hanford et al
Plaintiff: Scott Yeager, Hanford Executive Management Employee Association, Cathy Cain, Louis Camara, George Thomas Dibble, Timothy Ieronimo, Mary Rose Lindsay and Carlos Mestas
Defendant: City of Hanford, Hilary Straus, Dan Chin, Sue Sorensen, Jim Irwin, Lou Martinez and Joleen Jameson
Case Number: 1:2011cv00828
Filed: May 19, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 166 STIPULATION and ORDER for Dismissal, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/27/14. CASE CLOSED. (Verduzco, M)
May 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER granting extension of time to file dispositive documents to May 23, 2014 signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/9/14. (Nazaroff, H)
March 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER requiring parties to file dispositional documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/26/2014. (Hernandez, M)
March 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER VACATING TRIAL DATE OF APRIL 1, 2014 DO TO SETTLEMENT. signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/26/14. (Nazaroff, H)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER RE requested corrections to pretrial order signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/3/14. (Nazaroff, H)
January 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER RE: Motions for Summary Judgment (Docs. 85 , 88 , 114 , 115 ), Signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/29/2014. (Arellano, S.)
December 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER VACATING HEARING signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/11/2013. (IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the previously set hearing date of December 16, 2013, is VACATED, and the parties shall not appear at that time. As of December 16, 2013, the Court will take defendant's 115 motion for summary judgment under submission, and will thereafter issue its decision.)(Gaumnitz, R)
October 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER RE DISCOVERY MOTIONS 95 96 97 - Based upon the foregoing, it is HEREBY ORDERED that: Plaintiffs motions to compel are GRANTED; Defendants shall provide further responses to Plaintiffs interrogatories and requests for production of document s within twenty-one (21) days of the date of service of this order; Defendants shall pay Plaintiffs $5,557.00 in expenses associated with Plaintiffs motions to compel; and Defendants motion to quash is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/17/2013. (Hernandez, M)
October 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER re Stipulation to Extend Time - It is hereby ordered that defendants shall have until NOON on Wednesday, October 9, 2013 to provide a privilege log relatetd to Scott Nelson's investigation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/7/2013. (Hernandez, M)
October 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER that defendants shall provide copies of the documents to the Court for In Camera review no later than October 4, 2013. No later then October 4, 2013, defendants shall file a brief on the issue of whether the documents in Mr. Nelson's poss ession should be produced in response to plaintiff's request for production. Defendants shall also include a privilege log detailing any privileges applicable to these documents and no later then October 11, 2013, plaintiffs shall file a responsive brief on the issue of the documents in Mr. Nelson's possession. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/30/2013. (Hernandez, M)
June 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER Vacating Hearing Date of June 17, 2013 and Taking Matter Under Submission re: 88 Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/11/13. (Gonzalez, R)
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER Vacating Hearing Date of May 20, 2013 and Taking Matter Under Submission, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/14/13. (Verduzco, M)
August 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER DENYING Defendants' 70 Motion to Dismiss the Sixth, Seventh, and Ninth Causes of Action in the Second Amended Complaint signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/8/2012. (Sant Agata, S)
August 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 75 STIPULATION and ORDER Regarding Substitution of John Cain as Successor in Interest to Plaintiff Cathy Cain, Deceased signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 8/2/2012. (Sant Agata, S)
July 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 65 STIPULATION and ORDER continuing FRCP 16 Sceduling Conference, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/12/2012. (Scheduling Conference previously set for 7/16/2012 has been CONTINUED to 9/27/2012 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (DLB) before Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck) (Figueroa, O)
June 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER Re: 50 Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/12/2012. (Defendants motion to dismiss the first through fifth and eighth causes of action in the FAC as against them is DENIED. Defendants motion to dismiss the sixth, seventh and ninth causes of action in the FAC as against them is GRANTED with leave to amend. Plaintiffs shall have one final opportunity to amend within thirty days of entry of this order.) (Gaumnitz, R)
May 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER VACATING Hearing date of May, 14, 2012 and Taking Matter Under Submission, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/7/2012. (Kusamura, W)
April 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER RE: 47 Motion for Sanctions signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 04/25/2012. (Flores, E)
April 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER vacating hearing date of April 30, 2012 and taking matter under submission signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/24/12. (Nazaroff, H)
March 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER DENYING plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application for an Extension of Time to File a First Amended Complaint, document 42 ; order signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/12/2012. (Rooney, M)
March 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATION and ORDER to continue Scheduling Conference from 3/14/2012 to 5/21/2012 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (DLB) before Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 3/6/2012. (Hernandez, M)
February 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER RE: Motion for Reconsideration and/or Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 02/22/2012. (Flores, E)
February 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Vacating Hearing Date of February 13, 2012 and Taking Matter Under Submission signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 02/06/2012. (Flores, E)
December 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/2/2011 granting 31 Application for amendment of Court's 11/17/2011 Order to allow additional time in which to file a first amended complaint. ( Motions filed by 12/15/2011.)(Lundstrom, T)
December 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION and ORDER continuing FRCP 26(F) scheduling conference signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 12/1/2011. ( Initial Scheduling Conference previously set for 12/13/2011 has been CONTINUED to 3/14/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (DLB) before Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck) (Figueroa, O)
November 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 12 and Order Denying Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction 16 , signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/17/11. (Verduzco, M)
August 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION and ORDER Continuing FRCP 26(F) Status Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 8/22/2011. (Scheduling Conference previously set for 8/23/2011 has been CONTINUED to 10/26/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (DLB) before Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck) (Figueroa, O)
August 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER VACATING August 8, 2011 Hearing Date and Taking Matters Under Submission, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/3/11. (Hellings, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hanford Executive Management Employee Association et al v. City of Hanford et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Yeager
Represented By: Gary Marc Messing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hanford Executive Management Employee Association
Represented By: Gary Marc Messing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy Cain
Represented By: Gary Marc Messing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Camara
Represented By: Gary Marc Messing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Thomas Dibble
Represented By: Gary Marc Messing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Ieronimo
Represented By: Gary Marc Messing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Rose Lindsay
Represented By: Gary Marc Messing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Mestas
Represented By: Gary Marc Messing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Hanford
Represented By: Robert M. Dowd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilary Straus
Represented By: Robert M. Dowd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Chin
Represented By: Robert M. Dowd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sue Sorensen
Represented By: Robert M. Dowd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Irwin
Represented By: Robert M. Dowd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lou Martinez
Represented By: Robert M. Dowd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joleen Jameson
Represented By: Robert M. Dowd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?