Howard v. Bank of America, Inc.
Plaintiff: Natalie Howard
Defendant: Bank of America, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2011cv00891
Filed: May 27, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 704 Labor Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER DISMISSING ENTIRE ACTION With Prejudice signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 6/21/2016. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING an Initial Scheduling Conference set for 5/2/2016 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/18/2016. (Rooney, M)
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER. MDL No. 2138. Action is REMANDED to the Eastern District of California. Case reopened. (Robles, S)
June 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-10). CASE TRANSFERRED to the District of Kansas. MDL No. 2138. (Robles, S)
June 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING 5 Defendant's Ex Parte Application for an order extending the time to file a responsive pleading to 7/1/2011. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 6/6/2011. (Hernandez, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howard v. Bank of America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew C. Kane
Represented By: Michael David Mandel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalie Howard
Represented By: K. Poncho Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?