Burgess v. Raya, et al.
Plaintiff: Dwayne L. Burgess
Defendant: J. Raya, J. Garcia, J. Fernandez, E. Polanco, P. Morales, D. Tarnoff, Robaina and E. Rodriguez
Case Number: 1:2011cv00921
Filed: June 6, 2011
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 102 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/28/2017 to grant Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Eight Amendment Claim for failure to exhaust 60 . Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 9/21/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER DENYING 98 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/18/2017. (Jessen, A)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER directing Parties to advise whether Discovery is required on Eight Amendment Claim re 82 signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/27/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
September 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 73 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION to Grant Defendants' 60 Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/25/15. Referred to Judge O'Neill; 30-Day Deadline. (Verduzco, M)
July 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE REGARDING WHETHER THE CASE IS BARRED BY HECK v. HUMPHREY, 512 U.S. 477 (1994), ADOPTING FINDINGS and HOLDING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IN ABEYANCE FOR DECISION ON THAT ISSUE 60 signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/14/2015. (Lundstrom, T)
March 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER GRANTING Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Discovery and for Plaintiff to File an Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment re 61 signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/10/2015. Responses to Discovery due within thirty (30) days. Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment due within sixty (60) days. (Jessen, A)
December 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER GRANTING 58 Stipulation to Extend Discovery Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/18/2014. Discovery due by 1/15/2015. (Jessen, A)
May 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Adopting Findings and Recommendation 47 to Grant Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 35 Plaintiff's State Court Claims and Requested Declaratory Relief, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/15/14. (Verduzco, M)
April 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 47 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 35 Defendants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's State Court Claims and Requested Declaratory Relief be GRANTED re 27 Third Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/2/2014. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
January 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 SECOND INFORMATIONAL ORDER - NOTICE AND WARNING OF REQUIREMENTS for opposing 35 MOTION to DISMISS signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/23/2014. (Filing Deadline: 2/18/2014). (Lundstrom, T)
September 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Adopting 29 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION of Dismissal of Certain Claims signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/12/2013. (Sant Agata, S)
July 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER DISREGARDING 23 Defendants' Request for a Screening Order and ORDER GRANTING 24 Plaintiff's Motion to Withdraw the Second Amended Complaint and Construing the Corrected Second Amended Complaint (Doc. 25 ) as the Third Amended Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/15/2013. (Jessen, A)
July 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER DISCHARGING the Order to Show Cause 20 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/9/13. (Hellings, J)
December 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DISREGARDING 12 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/28/2012. (Jessen, A)
October 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DISMISSING 1 COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/17/2012. First Amended Complaint due within twenty-one (21) days. (Jessen, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burgess v. Raya, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwayne L. Burgess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Raya
Represented By: Susan Eileen Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Fernandez
Represented By: Susan Eileen Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Polanco
Represented By: Susan Eileen Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Morales
Represented By: Susan Eileen Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Tarnoff
Represented By: Susan Eileen Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robaina
Represented By: Susan Eileen Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Rodriguez
Represented By: Susan Eileen Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?