San Luis & Delta-Mendota Water Authority et al v. United States Department of Interior et al
Plaintiff: San Luis & Delta-Mendota Water Authority and Westlands Water District
Defendant: United States Department of Interior, Kenneth Lee Salazar, United States Fish and Wildlife Service, Rowan W. Gould, Ren Lohoefener, United States Bureau of Reclamation, Michael L. Connor and Donald R. Glaser
Intervenor_plaintiff: Save San Francisco Bay Association
Case Number: 1:2011cv00952
Filed: June 9, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Presiding Judge: Oliver W. Wanger
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 133 FOURTH STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND OTHER EXPENSES signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on July 13, 2016. (Munoz, I)
April 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 131 THIRD STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND OTHER EXPENSES signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on April 12, 2016. (Munoz, I)
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 129 SECOND STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND OTHER EXPENSES signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on February 17, 2016. (Munoz, I)
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 127 STIPULATION and ORDER regarding 120 MOTION for ATTORNEY FEES AND OTHER EXPENSES signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/16/2015. (Lundstrom, T)
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 115 JUDGMENT signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/25/2015. CASE CLOSED.(Lundstrom, T)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER RE CROSS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Docs. 99,100,104) signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/2/2015. (Munoz, I)
June 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE re Likelihood That Issues Raised in the Pending Cross Motions Will be of Practical Importance During This Water Year, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 6/24/2014. (The Parties are ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE in writin g on or before July 11, 2014 why it is of practical importance for this Court to rule on the pending motions in this case before the end of the water year (September 30, 2014). The parties are directed to file a brief joint response to this order to show cause.)(Gaumnitz, R)
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER Denying Plaintiffs' 83 Motion for Limited Discovery Without Prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 11/22/2013. (Martinez, A)
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 79 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING the parties' request allowing defendants to lodge copies of the administrative records on CD-ROMs, which will be lodged with the Clerk of the Court and served on plaintiffs' counsel. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/12/2013. (Rooney, M)
October 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF STANDING AND FOR FAILURE TO CHALLENGE A FINAL AGENCY ACTION 69 signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on October 17, 2012. (Munoz, I)
April 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER DENYING 56 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 4/25/2012. (Jessen, A)
March 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER Requesting Supplemental Declarations, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/5/2012. (Kusamura, W)
September 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 49 FINDINGS of FACT and CONCLUSIONS of LAW re: Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, signed by Senior Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 9/6/2011. (Kusamura, W)
August 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Joint STIPULATION and ORDER for extension of time for defendants' answer, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 8/4/2011. (Kusamura, W)
June 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Setting Hearing and Briefing Schedule Regarding Motions For Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 6/13/2011. ( 8 Motion For Temporary Restraining Order and 9 Motion for Preliminar y Injunction set for hearing 6/15/2011 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger. Any opposition papers shall be filed and served on or before 6/14/2011 at 3:00PM, Plaintiffs may present arguments in reply at the hearing. No additional bond beyond that required for any temporary restraining order shall be required, subject to further order of the Court.) (Gaumnitz, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: San Luis & Delta-Mendota Water Authority et al v. United States Department of Interior et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: San Luis & Delta-Mendota Water Authority
Represented By: Rebecca Rose Akroyd
Represented By: Daniel Joseph O'Hanlon
Represented By: Andrew Paul Tauriainen
Represented By: Hanspeter Walter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westlands Water District
Represented By: Rebecca Rose Akroyd
Represented By: Daniel Joseph O'Hanlon
Represented By: Andrew Paul Tauriainen
Represented By: Hanspeter Walter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Interior
Represented By: Charles Ray Shockey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Lee Salazar
Represented By: Charles Ray Shockey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Fish and Wildlife Service
Represented By: Charles Ray Shockey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rowan W. Gould
Represented By: Charles Ray Shockey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ren Lohoefener
Represented By: Charles Ray Shockey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Bureau of Reclamation
Represented By: Charles Ray Shockey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael L. Connor
Represented By: Charles Ray Shockey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald R. Glaser
Represented By: Charles Ray Shockey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Save San Francisco Bay Association
Represented By: Paul A. Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?