Calloway v. Kelley et al
Plaintiff: Jamisi Jermaine Calloway
Defendant: G. Kelley, Flavin, Marc Talisman, Jeffrey Wang, Melissa Fritz and Davita Hemo Dialysis Unit
Case Number: 1:2011cv01090
Filed: July 1, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Gerald B. Cohn
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 112 FINDINGS And RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Cross-Motions For Summary Judgment (ECF No. 87 , 93 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/6/2015. F&R's referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 9/11/2015.(Fahrney, E)
April 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER Denying 88 Plaintiff's Request to Extend Discovery and Granting Plaintiff Thirty Days to File Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/15/15. Thirty Day Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
December 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 73 Motion for Leave to Conduct Depositions by Oral Examination, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/12/2014. (Marrujo, C)
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 68 Motion Amend Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/17/14. (Martin-Gill, S)
October 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER DISCHARGING 64 Motion for Order to Show Cause; ORDER DECLINING 67 Motion for Default Judgment Against Defendants: Talisman and Fieitz, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/14/14. (Martin-Gill, S)
September 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER EXTENDING Discovery and Scheduling Order Deadlines Set Forth in Court's April 15, 2014, Order to Defendants signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/10/2014. (Jessen, A)
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER for Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE Why Entry of Default Should Not Be Entered Against Defendants Talisman and Fritz 57 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/4/14: 20-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
March 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Appointmnet of Counsel and Expert Witness (ECF No. 53 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/18/2014. (Fahrney, E)
March 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 51 Motion to Set Aside Discovery Orders as Premature signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/10/2014. (Sant Agata, S)
March 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Extending Discovery and Scheduling Order Deadline Set Forth in Court's February 24, 2014 Order to Defendants Peter Mazuk and V. Schomer re 37 , 45 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/4/14. (Gonzalez, R)
February 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Extending Discovery and Scheduling Order Deadlines Set Forth in Court's signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/26/14. (Verduzco, M)
October 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SECOND ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Submit Service Documents and USM-185 Forms for Service of Process by the United States Marshal's Office, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/31/13. Thirty-Day Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
September 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Denying 18 Motion for Reconsideration, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/16/13. (Verduzco, M)
September 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Request for Court Order and Reconsideration of Request for Appointment of 14 , 15 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/6/13: This action shall proceed against Defendants Kelley, Talisman, Wang, Frit z, Schomer, Mazuk, Trinh, Bostanjian, and Syed; Defendant Falvin is DISMISSED from this action; Plaintiff's motion for copying is DENIED; and Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration of the order denying appointment of counsel is DENIED. (Hellings, J)
May 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 9 Motion to Amend as Unnecessary; ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 11 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone on 5/23/2013. (Marrujo, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Calloway v. Kelley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamisi Jermaine Calloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flavin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc Talisman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Fritz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davita Hemo Dialysis Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?