United States v. Approximately $77,000.00 in U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: United States
Defendant: Approximately $77,000.00 in U.S. Currency
Claimant: Felix Velasco
Case Number: 1:2011cv01251
Filed: July 28, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 90 FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/25/2014. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
February 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 85 STIPULATION to Extend Local Rule 160 Deadline to File Final Dispositional Documents; ORDER Thereon signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/28/2014. (Martinez, A)
January 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 80 STIPULATION and Status Report and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/9/2014. Status Conference currently set for 1/14/2014 is CONTINUED to 2/13/2014 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (GSA) before Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin. (Martinez, A)
December 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER Regarding Claimant's 44 Motion to Strike Complaint and/or Dismiss Action and Plaintiff's 47 Motion to Amend the Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/20/2013. Status Conference set for 1/14/2014 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (GSA) before Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin. (Martinez, A)
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER Temporarily Vacating Claimant's 44 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Plaintiff's 47 Motion to Amend the Complaint, Pending Filing of a Status Report and Notice of Claimant's Death by Claimant's Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/30/2013. (Martinez, A)
January 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATION and ORDER to Continue Hearing on Claimant Felix Velasco's Motion to Dismiss and United States' Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/31/2013. Motions 44 and 47 currently set for hearing on 2/15/2013 are CONTINUED to 3/8/2013 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (GSA) before Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin.(Martinez, A)
January 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 48 FIRST AMENDED STIPULATION to Continue FRCP Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order Discovery Dates and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/28/2013. Deadlines extended as follows: Non-Expert Discovery due by 3/22/2013; Expert Disclosure due by 4/5/2013; Supplemental Expert Disclosure due by 4/19/2013; Expert Discovery due by 5/13/2013; Non-Dispositive Motions filed by 5/20/2013.(Martinez, A)
April 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Regarding Claimant Felix Velasco's 18 Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/10/2012. (Bradley, A)
November 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION and ORDER to Continue Briefing Dates re Claimant's Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 11/7/2011. (Bradley, A)
October 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER of REFERENCE to Magistrate Judge and to RESET Summary Judgment Motion signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/28/2011. (Sant Agata, S)
October 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE MOTION DATES AND ORDER THEREON signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on October 13, 2011. Motion Hearing currently set for 10/31/2011 is VACATED. (Munoz, I)
August 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Regarding Clerk's Issuance of Warrant for Arrest of Articles In Rem, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/2/11. (Verduzco, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States v. Approximately $77,000.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States
Represented By: Heather Mardel Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $77,000.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Felix Velasco
Represented By: Edward Michael Burch
Represented By: David Martin Michael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?