Renato Quezada v. Maurice Junious, et al
Plaintiff: Renato D Quezada
Defendant: Maurice Junious and - Scotts
Case Number: 1:2011cv01254
Filed: July 29, 2011
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Gerald B. Cohn
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion For Reconsideration As Moot (Doc. 19 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald B. Cohn on 10/13/2011. (Fahrney, E)
September 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Rule 60(a) Correction to ORDER Filed September 8, 2011, Amending Order and Dismissing Action for Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies 14 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald B. Cohn on 9/15/11. (Verduzco, M)
September 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Dismissing Action for Failure to Obey Court Order 10 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald B. Cohn on 9/7/11. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
August 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Regarding Exhaustion signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald B. Cohn on 08/01/2011. Show Cause Response due by 9/6/2011. (Flores, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Renato Quezada v. Maurice Junious, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renato D Quezada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maurice Junious
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: - Scotts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?