Clifton Perry v. Acting Warden Michael Martel
Petitioner: Clifton Perry
Respondent: Michael Martel
Case Number: 1:2011cv01367
Filed: August 16, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER DIRECTING Petitioner to File Quarterly Status Reports Regarding State Exhaustion Proceedings 64 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/9/14: Second Satus Report due no later than July 22, 2014, and then beginning again on December 1, 2014. (Hellings, J)
November 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER STIKING the Warden's 65 Notice of Lodging State Record Documents as Premature and Returning Paper Documents to both parties, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/19/13. (Documents returned to filers as ordered herein)(Martin-Gill, S)
July 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER Modifying July 18, 2013 Order Granting Abeyance and Directing Petitioner's Counsel to File Quarterly Status Reports 58 , signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/23/13. (Verduzco, M)
July 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Granting 52 Abeyance and Directing Petitioner's Counsel to File Quarterly Status Reports, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/18/13. (Verduzco, M)
June 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER DIRECTING Respondent to Submit Supplemental Brief, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/31/13: Hearing set for June 3, 2013 is VACATED; Respondent's Supplemental Brief due June 24, 2013. (Hellings, J)
October 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Setting Phase II Briefing Schedule, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/10/12. (Verduzco, M)
June 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING 27 Motion for Equitable Tolling, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 06/27/2012. (Martin-Gill, S)
December 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER re: Phase II Case Management, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/21/11. (Verduzco, M)
November 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Case Management ORDER Regarding Pleadings, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/23/11. (Verduzco, M)
November 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Following Phase I Case Management Conference signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/07/2011. (Flores, E)
October 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER APPOINTING Counsel and Initiating Case Management Procedures, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/3/11: Case Evaluation Forms shall be filed by October 13, 2011; The Phase I case management plan and budget shall be filed under seal by no later than 4:00 p.m. on October 27, 2011; The Court will conduct a telephonic case management and budget conference at 9:00 a.m. on November 3, 2011 with counsel for Perry initiating the call. (Hellings, J)
August 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting Application for Appointment of Counsel 1 and Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis 2 , 3 ; DENYING Without Prejudice Request for Stay of Execution 1 , signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/18/11. (Gonzalez, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clifton Perry v. Acting Warden Michael Martel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michael Martel
Represented By: Ward Allen Campbell
Represented By: Jennevee Han De Guzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Clifton Perry
Represented By: Joseph Schlesinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?