Nuriddin v. Estrella et al
Plaintiff: Muhammad Nuriddin
Defendant: Estrella, Miller, Rios and A.W. Bell
Case Number: 1:2011cv01448
Filed: August 29, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Merced
Presiding Judge: Gerald B. Cohn
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER Denying 58 Plaintiff's Motion for Relief Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 59(e) and Motion for Reconsideration Under Rule 60(b), signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/15/16. (Gonzalez, R)
July 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 51 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment 37 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/24/15. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R Due Within Thirty Days. (Gonzalez, R)
May 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Denying 47 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/18/15. (Verduzco, M)
May 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER DISMISSING Defendant Bell, without prejudice, pursuant to Rule 4(M) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 05/13/2015. A.W. Bell terminated. (Martin-Gill, S)
May 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER GRANTING Defendant's 41 Motion to Stay Discovery, as to the Merits only until further order of the Court, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 05/12/2015. (Martin-Gill, S)
March 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Granting Plaintiff Thirty Days To Provide Further Information As To Location Of Defendant Miller (ECF No. 34 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/27/2015. (Filing Deadline: 4/30/2015)(Fahrney, E)
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER DISCHARGING 23 Order to Show Cause Why Defendant Bell Should Not be Dismissed; ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 36 Motion for Substitution and GRANTING Plaintiff Thirty Days to Make Proper Substitution, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/19/2015. (Marrujo, C)
January 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion to Extend the Time to File Motion for Substitution 26 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/14/15: 30 Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
January 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION Recommending Dismissal of Defendant Miller Pursuant to Rule 4(M) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 19 , 23 , 26 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/13/15: Thirty-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
October 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER REGARDING Plaintiff's 24 Request for Clarification of the Summons and Service of Process by the United States Marshal, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/9/14. (Marrujo, C)
October 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Regarding Service of Process Upon Defendants Bell and Miller 20 , 21 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/1/14: Thirty (30) Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DISMISSING CERTAIN CLAIM AND DEFENDANT, Estrella FROM ACTION FOR FAILURETO STATE A COGNIZABLE CLAIM signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/24/2014. (Lundstrom, T)
February 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER ADDRESSING Plaintiff's Motion for Status and DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment as Premature 7 , 11 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone on 2/21/13. (Hellings, J)
August 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Denying 8 Motion for Appointment of Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald B. Cohn on 8/22/12. (Verduzco, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nuriddin v. Estrella et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Muhammad Nuriddin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estrella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?