Dubrin et al v. Bonilla
Plaintiff: Dubrin, Richardson, Youngblood, Jackson II, Lopez, Ramirez, Barriga, Gonzales, Carmona, Hernandez, Moreno, Rogers, Malone, Reyes, Flores, Gutierrez, Talamantez, Zavala, Newman, Stram, Besheer, Jara-A, Rosenthal, Bradford, Prange, Coronado, Cantero, Hall and Richards
Defendant: Bonilla, Michael Stainer, Bounville and Matthew Cate
Case Number: 1:2011cv01484
Filed: September 2, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER CLOSING CASE, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/19/17: The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to close this action. (CASE CLOSED)(Hellings, J)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER Adopting 167 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, and DENYING Plaintiff Hall's Request to Rescind Settlement signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/13/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER Adopting 162 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, DENYING Plaintiff Hall's 161 Request to Rescind Settlement signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/10/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER STRIKING 160 Order Granting Attorney Mark Ravis' Motion to Withdraw Solely as to Joaquin Coronado; ORDER DISCHARGING 167 Order to Show Cause and Striking Findings and Recommendation to Dismiss Solely as to Joaquin Coronado; ORDER STRIK ING 168 Motion to Vacate as Duplicative; ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Terminate Attorney Mark Ravis From Representing Plaintiff Aaron Prange and Serve Findings and Recommendation on Plaintiff Prange, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/28/17. Twenty-One Day Deadline. (Marrujo, C)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 167 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending to Dismiss Plaintiffs Joaquin Coronado and Aaron Prange for their Failure to Prosecute this Action signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 04/05/2017. Referred to Judge Drozd; Objections to F&R due by 5/1/2017. (Flores, E)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 162 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Hold Plaintiff, Tony Hall, to the Settlement he Signed; 30-Day Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/28/2017. Referred to Judge Dale A. Drozd. Objections to F&R due by 4/3/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER Discharging Order to Show Cause and GRANTING Request of Attorney Mark Ravis to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Joaquin Coronado and Aaron Prange 155 , 158 ; ORDER to SHOW CAUSE to Plaintiffs Coronado and Prange Why the Matter Should Not Be Dismissed for Their Failure to Prosecute the Action, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/14/17: 21-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Sanctions Should Not Be Imposed for Failure to Comply with the Court's Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/3/17. Show Cause Response Due Within Ten Days. (Gonzalez, R)
December 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER to TONY HALL to Notify the Court Whether He Will Participate in the Settlement or Whether He Will Prosecute His Case on His Own, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/27/2016. (Hall, S)
December 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER Granting Extension of Time to Meet with Plaintiff Hall and Extending Deadline to File Motion to Withdraw re 148 , 149 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/12/16. Motion Deadline: 12/23/2016. (Gonzalez, R)
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER REGARDING SETTLEMENT and for Additional Status Report, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/5/2016. Joint status report due by 12/26/2016. Motion to withdraw due by 12/16/2016. Report as to plaintiff Hall due by 12/9/2016. (Hall, S)
November 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER ADOPTING 143 Findings and Recommendations Approving 140 Minor's Compromise, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/23/16. (Marrujo, C)
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 143 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that the Motion to Approve Compromise of Minor's Claims (Doc. 140 be GRANTED re 38 Third Amended Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/5/2016. Referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER DISCHARGING 139 Order to Show Cause, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/4/2016. (Hall, S)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER to PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEl to SHOW CAUSE Why Sanctions Should Not Be Imposed for His Failure to Comply with the Court' Orders; ORDER Requiring Further Status Report, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/26/2016. Show Cause Response due by 10/3/2016. Further joint status report due by 12/2/2016. (Hall, S)
June 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER DISMISSING Plaintiffs Flores, Cormona, Barriga, and Lopez for Failure to Prosecute and ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 94 , 95 , 100 , 119 , and 127 , signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 6/16/16. (Hellings, J)
May 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER After Status Conference,signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 05/20/2016. (Martin-Gill, S)
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 127 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Dismiss Plaintiffs Flores and Cormona for Their Failure to Prosecute This Action 119 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/28/16: 14-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
April 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER Granting 107 Motion to Intervene or Substitute Party by Plaintiff Zavala, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/28/16. Zavala terminated. (Gonzalez, R)
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER DISCHARGING Order to Show Cause Solely as to Plaintiff Richards re 122 ; ORDER STRIKING 119 Order Granting Attorney Mark Ravis' Motion to Withdraw as to Matthew Richards Only, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/12/16. (Marrujo, C)
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER DIRECTING Correction of Clerical Error of Plaintiff "Stram" to "Strain", signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/6/16. (Marrujo, C)
April 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER GRANTING 118 Request of Attorney Mark Ravis to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Jimmy Flores, Reynaldo Cormona, and Matthew Richards; ORDER to SHOW CAUSE to Plaintiffs Flores, Cormona, and Richards Why the Matter Should Not Be Dismissed for Their Failure to Prosecute the Action, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/5/16. Twenty-One Day Deadline. (Marrujo, C)
March 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER REQUIRING GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR THE SUBSTITUTE HEIR FOR JUAN ZAVALA TO FILE THE DECLARATION REQUIRED BY CCP 377.32 signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/25/2016. ( Filing Deadline: 4/8/2016.) (Lundstrom, T)
March 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER DISCHARGING 105 Order to Show Cause Issued to Plaintiffs' Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/22/2016. (Hall, S)
March 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER REQUIRING DEFENDANTS TO FILE OPPOSITION OR NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO 107 MOTION TO INTERVENE, (Filing Deadline: 3/28/2016) AND ORDER TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL TO FILE MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS TO THE ABSENT PLAINTIFFS, (Motion Filing Deadline: 4/4/2016) signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/21/2016. (Lundstrom, T)
March 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER GRANTING Application for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem 106 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/11/16: Jessica Lynne Bergreen appointed. (Hellings, J)
March 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER REQUIRING Plaintiffs' Counsel to File Further Response to the Order to SHOW CAUSE Why Sanctions Should Not Be Imposed for Failure to Comply with the Court's Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/10/2016. Show Cause Response due within 10 days. (Hall, S)
March 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER to PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL to SHOW CAUSE Why Sanctions Should Not Be Imposed for Failure to Comply with the Court's Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/3/2016. Show Cause Response due within 5 days. (Hall, S)
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER GRANTING 94 Counsel's Motion to Withdraw as to Plaintiff's Barriga and Lopez; ORDER to Plaintiff's Counsel to Report the Names of the Plaintiffs With Whom He Has No Contact; ORDER GRANTING 93 Request to Withdraw Motion to Sub stitute Aurora Zabala for the Deceased Plaintiff; and ORDER re Settlement signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/16/2016. "No Contact" Report due by 2/22/2016. Motion to Withdraw and Renewed Motion to Substitute due by 3/11/2016. Joint Report re Settlement due by 3/18/2016. (Jessen, A)
January 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER to DEFENDANTS to File an Opposition or Statement of Non-Opposition to 93 the Motion of Aurora Zabala to Substitute as Successor in Interest, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/25/2016. Opposition or non-opposition due by 2/5/2016. (Hall, S)
November 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER CONSTRUING "Notice of Potential Substitution of Rights" as a Notice of Death; ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFFS to File Proof of Personal Service on the Decedent's Heirs, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/16/2015. (Hall, S)
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER to PLAINTIFFS to SHOW CAUSE Why Sanctions Should Not Be Imposed for Their Failure to Comply With the Court's Orders, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/9/2015. Show Cause Response due by 11/16/2015. (Hall, S)
October 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER AFTER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/29/2015. (Hall, S)
September 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER Setting Settlement Conference set for 10/28/2015 at 01:30 PM in US District Court 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/10/2015. (Kusamura, W)
July 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 76 FURTHER SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/23/2015. Expert Discovery Completed by 12/30/2016. Non-Dispositive Motions related to experts: Filed by 1/15/2016; Hearing by 2/12/2016. Pretrial Conference set for 3/22/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Jury Trial set for 5/24/2016 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Hall, S)
June 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER LIFTING STAY; ORDER SETTING FURTHER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/24/2015. Further Scheduling Conference set for 7/23/2015 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Telephonic appearances via CourtCall are authorized. (Hall, S)
May 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER RE: STAY, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/15/2015. (Hall, S)
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER DISREGARDING Order to Show Cause 62 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/17/15: Response Due April 20, 2015. (Hellings, J)
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Sanctions Should Not Be Imposed and Why the Discovery Stay Should Not Be Lifted for Failure to Comply With the Court's Order signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/4/2015. Show Cause Response due within fourteen (14) days. (Jessen, A)
February 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER on Stipulation to Stay Discovery and GRANTING an Extension of Time to Advise Re Settlement Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/3/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
January 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER Requiring Parties To Notify Court Whether A Settlement Conference Would Be Beneficial, 15-Day Deadline, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/23/2015. (Case Management Deadline: 2/10/2015)(Fahrney, E)
November 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 58 FURTHER SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/26/2014. Expert Discovery to be completed by 3/27/2015. Pretrial Conference set for 6/2/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Jury Trial set for 7/28/2015 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Hall, S)
October 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER SETTING FURTHER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/9/2014. Scheduling Conference set for 11/25/2014 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Appearances via CourtCall are authorized. (Hall, S)
February 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER DISCHARGING 49 Order to Show Cause and WITHDRAWING 50 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION to Dismiss Case for Failure to Obey a Court Order signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/27/2014. (Sant Agata, S)
February 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 50 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION to Dismiss Case for Failure to Prosecute and Failure to Obey a Court Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/13/14, referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R Due Within Thirty Days. (Marrujo, C)
January 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER to PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL to SHOW CAUSE Why Sanctions Should Not Be Imposed for Their Failure to Comply with the Court's Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/14/2014. Show Cause Response due within 14 days. (Hall, S)
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER ADOPTING 28 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and DISMISSING Defendant Cate signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/18/2013. (Jessen, A)
January 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER GRANTING 41 Stipulation for Protective Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/25/13. (Marrujo, C)
July 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Defendant Cate be DISMISSED re 24 Amended Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/12/2012. Referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R due within fourteen (14) days. (Jessen, A)
June 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 20 Motion to Dismiss In Part and DENYING In Part, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/25/2012. Plaintiffs Are Granted 14 Days Leave to Amend. (Marrujo, C)
March 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTIN IN PART and DENYING IN PART Motion to Dismiss 14 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/6/12: The motion to dismiss as to Defendant Cate GRANTED; The motion to dismiss as to Defendant Stainer is DENIED; The first cause of action is DISMISSED; The complaint as Defendants Cate and Stainer in their official capacities is DISMISSED; Plaintiffs are granted 14 days leave to amend. (Hellings, J)
October 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER finding service of complaint appropriate and directing Clerk of Court to issue summons signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/28/2011. (Lundstrom, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dubrin et al v. Bonilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dubrin
Represented By: Karen Joan Travis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richardson
Represented By: Karen Joan Travis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Youngblood
Represented By: Karen Joan Travis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackson II
Represented By: Karen Joan Travis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lopez
Represented By: Karen Joan Travis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramirez
Represented By: Karen Joan Travis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barriga
Represented By: Karen Joan Travis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gonzales
Represented By: Karen Joan Travis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmona
Represented By: Karen Joan Travis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hernandez
Represented By: Karen Joan Travis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moreno
Represented By: Karen Joan Travis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rogers
Represented By: Karen Joan Travis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malone
Represented By: Karen Joan Travis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reyes
Represented By: Karen Joan Travis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flores
Represented By: Karen Joan Travis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gutierrez
Represented By: Karen Joan Travis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Talamantez
Represented By: Karen Joan Travis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zavala
Represented By: Karen Joan Travis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Newman
Represented By: Karen Joan Travis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stram
Represented By: Karen Joan Travis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Besheer
Represented By: Karen Joan Travis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jara-A
Represented By: Karen Joan Travis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosenthal
Represented By: Karen Joan Travis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradford
Represented By: Karen Joan Travis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prange
Represented By: Karen Joan Travis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coronado
Represented By: Karen Joan Travis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cantero
Represented By: Karen Joan Travis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hall
Represented By: Karen Joan Travis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richards
Represented By: Karen Joan Travis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Stainer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bounville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Cate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?