Walsh, individually and as Successor-in-Interest to S.W., Deceased v. Tehachapi Unified School District et al
Plaintiff: Wendy Walsh
Defendant: Tehachapi Unified School District, Superintendent Swanson, Susan Ortega, Mr. Kaminsky, Ms. Kirby, Ms. Haight, Mrs. Kabonic and Mr. Feehan
Case Number: 1:2011cv01489
Filed: September 2, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER To DISMISS And Close Case (Doc. 82 ), signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 4/15/2014. CASE CLOSED. (Fahrney, E)
March 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER AFTER SETTLEMENT (Doc. 80) signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on March 21, 2014. (Munoz, I)
March 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER SEALING 75 Joint Pretrial Statement, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/7/14. (Gonzalez, R)
February 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER GRANTING Stipulation 71 to Vacate the Settlement Conference in Light of the Parties' Agreement to Engage in Private Mediation, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/19/2014. (Hall, S)
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT 57 signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on February 4, 2014. (Munoz, I)
January 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STIPULATION and ORDER to Amend the Scheduling Order to Continue the Settlement Conference and Pretrial Conference re 65 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/28/2014. Pretrial Conference CONTINUED to 3/3/2014 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Settlement Conference CONTINUED to 2/24/2014 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
November 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER re: STIPULATION to Amend the Scheduling Order to Continue the Settlement Conference 55 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/4/2013. Settlement Conference CONTINUED to 2/5/2014 at 09:30 AM at the United States Courthouse, 510 19th Street (JLT), Bakersfield, before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER re: Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 46 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/23/13. (Gonzalez, R)
August 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 PRELIMINARY RULING ON EVIDENTIARY OBJECTION signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on August 7, 2013. (Munoz, I)
July 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER VACATING HEARING AND REQUESTING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on July 23, 2013. (Munoz, I)
April 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Stipulation to amend the scheduling order ; ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/19/2013. (Non-expert Discovery due by 8/2/2013; Expert Discovery due by 9/20/2013; Non-Dispositive Motions filed by 9/20/2013; Non-Dispositive Motions heard by 10/18/2013; Settlement Conference set for 11/7/2013 at 10:00 AM in Bakersfield at 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston; Dispositive Motions filed by 11/8/2013; Dispositive Motions heard by 1/2/2014; Pretrial Conference set for 2/18/2014 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Jury Trial set for 4/29/2014 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill ) (Figueroa, O)
December 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER GRANTING Stipulation to Amend Scheduling Order re 42 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/7/2012. Discovery Deadlines: Non-expert 5/24/2013; Expert Disclosure 5/30/2013; Joint Rebuttal Expert Disclosure 6/21/2013; Expert Di scovery 7/19/2013. Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 7/11/2013; Heard by 8/22/2013. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 7/19/2013; Heard by 8/16/2013. Settlement Conference set for 9/19/2013 at 10:00 AM at the United States Courthouse , 510 19th Street, Bakersfield, before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Pretrial Conference set for 11/13/2013 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Jury Trial set for 1/7/2014 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Hall, S)
May 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GRANTING 34 Motion for Appointment of Wendy Walsh as Guardian Ad Litem for Minor Sh. W. and is authorized to prosecute this action on his behalf, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 04/30/2012. (Martin-Gill, S)
April 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING Stipulation RE: Extension of time to Amend Pleadings, leave to amend to add plaintiff, and petition for relief, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/18/2012. (Kusamura, W)
February 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION and ORDER to File First Amended Answer signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/28/2012. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
January 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION and ORDER to Protect Confidential Information signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/23/2012. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
December 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER to Dismiss Defendants, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/14/11: This action is DISMISSED without prejudice as to Defendants Superintendent Swanson, Ms. Kirby, Ms. Haight, Mrs. Kabonic and Mr. Feehan only. The Clerk is directed NOT to close this action. (Hellings, J)
October 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER on Defendant's Motions to Dismiss 7 , 8 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/27/11. Granting in Part and Denying in Part Motions. Amended Complaint due by 11/11/2011. (Gonzalez, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walsh, individually and as Successor-in-Interest to S.W., Deceased v. Tehachapi Unified School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Walsh
Represented By: Daniel Rodriguez
Represented By: Charles R. Chapman
Represented By: Joel T Andreesen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tehachapi Unified School District
Represented By: Michael Charles Kellar
Represented By: Daniel Phillip Barer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superintendent Swanson
Represented By: Michael Charles Kellar
Represented By: Daniel Phillip Barer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Ortega
Represented By: Michael Charles Kellar
Represented By: Daniel Phillip Barer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Kaminsky
Represented By: Daniel Phillip Barer
Represented By: Michael Charles Kellar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Kirby
Represented By: Arnold J Anchordoquy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Haight
Represented By: Arnold J Anchordoquy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mrs. Kabonic
Represented By: Arnold J Anchordoquy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Feehan
Represented By: Arnold J Anchordoquy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?