Bever v. Cal-Western Reconveyance Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Glenn W. Bever
Defendant: Cal-Western Reconveyance Corp., CitiMortgage, Inc. and Mortgage Electronic Registration Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2011cv01584
Filed: September 20, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER LIFTING STAY and ORDER GRANTING 45 Defendant Cal-Western Reconveyance's Motion to Dismiss signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/9/2018. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
January 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER On Motion To Approve Recording Of Lis Pendens And Order Striking Notice Of Pendency Of Action (Doc.Nos. 176 , 177 ), signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/14/2016. (Fahrney, E)
October 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER on Defendant's 138 Motion for Summary Judgment; ORDER Dissoving Preliminary Injunction; ORDER for FINAL JUDGMENT under Rule 54(b); and ORDER for STATUS Report from Defendant Cal-Western, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/30/2014. (Kusamura, W)
October 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER VACATING Pre-Trial Conference and Trial Dates, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/9/2014. (IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the October 14, 2014 pre-trial conference and the November 18, 2014 trial dates are VACATED. Once the summary judgment motion has been ruled upon, the Court will reset the pre-trial conference and trial dates, if necessary.)(Gaumnitz, R)
September 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER for additional information and order vacating hearing date of 9/29/14. signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/23/14. (Nazaroff, H)
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER on 145 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time and ORDER VACATING September 15, 2014 Hearing Date signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/4/2014. Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/15/2014. Reply due by 9/22/2014. Motion Hearing re Motion for Summary Judgment RESET for 9/29/2014 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Pretrial Conference RESET for 10/14/2014 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Jessen, A)
July 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER ; granting 142 Motion for Extension and vacating August 18, 2014 hearing date. signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/30/14. (Nazaroff, H)
July 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER Vacating Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/9/14. (Verduzco, M)
June 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER On Plaintiff's Motion To Alter Or Amend An Order And Order Striking Amended Objections (Doc.Nos. 129 , 130 ), signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/27/2014. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: Plaintiffs Rule 59(e) motion to alter or amend the Courts May 8, 2014 order (Doc. No. 129 ) is DENIED. Plaintiffs amended objections (Doc. No. 130 ) is STRICKEN from the docket. (Fahrney, E)
June 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER Continuing Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/25/2014.(Settlement Conference set for 7/11/2014 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone) (Fahrney, E)
June 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER on 125 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and Plaintiff's Motions to Alter and Vacate Deadlines and Scheduling Order signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 05/04/2014. (Flores, E)
May 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 125 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS that Plaintiff's Motions be Denied 106 , 108 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/15/14. Referred to Judge Ishii; 14-Day Deadline. (Verduzco, M)
May 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER on Plaintiff's Objections to the Magistrate Judge's April 18, 2014 Ruling on Motions to Amend, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/7/14. (Verduzco, M)
April 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion to Amend 91 and 98 . Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/17/2014. (Timken, A)
February 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER on Plaintiff's Objections to the December 6, 2013 Scheduling Order (Docs. 87 , 96 ), Signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/13/2014. (Arellano, S.)
December 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 87 SCHEDULING ORDER (Fed. R. Civ. P. 16) signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 12/6/2013. (Any requests for leave to amend pleadings: 2/7/2014, Initial Disclosures: 12/20/2013, Non Expert Discovery: 6/6/2014, Expert Disclosure: 6/13/2014, Supp lemental Expert Disclosures: 6/27/2014, Expert Discovery: 7/11/2014, Non-Dispositive Motion Filing ddl: 7/14/2014, Non-Dispositive Motion Hrg ddl: 8/13/2014, Dispositive Motion Filing ddl: 7/14/2014, Dispositive Motion Hrg ddl: 8/18/2014, Settleme nt Conference set for 6/30/2014, at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone, Pretrial Conference set for 10/1/2014, at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii, and Bench Trial (2 days) set for 11/18/2014, at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii.) (Gaumnitz, R)
November 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER on Plaintiff's Motions to Alter or Amend Orders 80 , 81 , signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/31/13. (Verduzco, M)
October 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Defendants' Motion to Supplement, and Plaintiff's Motion to Strike 64 , signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/1/13. (Verduzco, M)
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER VACATING May 15, 2013 Hearing and Taking Matter Under Submission signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/14/2013. (Sant Agata, S)
March 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER GRANTING Motion for Leave to File a Late Response to the Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 50 ) and Allowing Defendants to File Any Reply by March 26, 2013, Signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/20/2013. (Arellano, S.)
September 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER vacating hearing date of 9/17/12 and taking matter under submission. signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/14/12. (Nazaroff, H)
June 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 AMENDED ORDER GRANTING Defendants' Motions to Dismiss 13 & 31 , signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/27/2012. (Amended Complaint Due Within 21 Days.) (Marrujo, C)
June 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' Motions to Dismiss, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/22/2012. Amended Complaint Due Within Twenty-One Days. (Marrujo, C)
April 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER VACATING April 23, 2012 hearing date and taking matter under submission signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/19/2012. (Figueroa, O)
February 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER DENYING, without prejudice, plaintiff's request for entry of default as to defendant Cal-Western Reconveyance Corporation, document 27 . The Court further PERMITS defendant Cal-Western Reconveyance Corporation to file a responsive pleading within 21 days of the issuance of this order; order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/28/2012. (Rooney, M)
November 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER vacating hearing date of November 14, 2011 and taking matter under submission. signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/9/2011. (Nazaroff, H)
October 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S RENEWED MOTION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER Motion Hearing set for 11/14/2011 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii.) signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/26/2011. (Nazaroff, H)
September 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DENYING 2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/23/2011. (Arellano, S.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bever v. Cal-Western Reconveyance Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn W. Bever
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cal-Western Reconveyance Corp.
Represented By: Nicole K. Neff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CitiMortgage, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher L. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Services, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher L. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?