Smith v. Pina et al
Plaintiff: Robert Lewis Smith
Defendant: S. Pina, H. Sumaya, P. Munoz and Estrada
Case Number: 1:2011cv01651
Filed: September 29, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER DISMISSING CASE Pursuant to Stipulation for Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 2/19/2015. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
August 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER DENYING 40 , 43 Plaintiff's Motions to Compel and ORDER GRANTING 42 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 8/6/2014. Discovery cut-off date is extended nunc pro tunc to 7/7/2014. Defendants are ordered to make further responses to Plaintiff's second set of requests for admission within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
July 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER & WRIT Of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 7/20/2014. (Fahrney, E)
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER adopting 32 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and denying 29 Motion to Dismiss signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/30/2013. ( Filing Deadline set for 11/4/2013 for Pina to file a response to First Amended Complaint). (Lundstrom, T)
August 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Deny Defendant Pina's 29 Motion to Dismiss; Objections Due within Fourteen Days signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 8/15/2013. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Objections to F&R due by 9/3/2013. (Sant Agata, S)
December 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 AMENDED ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 12/5/2012 grating 25 MOTION for EXTENSION OF TIME to file response by S. Pina. (Response due by 12/18/2012). (Lundstrom, T)
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Granting Defendant's First Motion To Extend Time To Respond To First Amended Complaint (Doc. 25 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 12/3/2012. (Fahrney, E)
July 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER ADOPTING 18 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and Dismissing Certain Claims and Defendants signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 06/0/32012. Sumaya, Estrada and Munoz terminated from Action. (Flores, E)
May 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that that Plaintiff States a Cognizable Claim and Recommending Dismissal of Certain Claims and Defendants re 17 First Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 5/24/2012. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
April 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Motion For Return Of Documents (ECF No. 13 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 4/3/2012. (Original Complaint Enclosed.) (Fahrney, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Pina et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Lewis Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Pina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Sumaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estrada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?