Alonso v. Blackstone Financial Group, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Rosario Alonso
Defendant: Blackstone Financial Group, LLC
Case Number: 1:2011cv01693
Filed: October 10, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER directing parties to notify the Court of their intent to retrieve the deposition transcripts by 5/22/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/15/2015. (Hernandez, M)
February 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 106 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/25/2014. (Hernandez, M)
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER VACATING February 26, 2014 hearing - Accordingly, the previous scheduled hearing set on February 26, 2014 at 10:00 a.m. is hereby VACATED and the parties will not be required to appear at that time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/24/2014. (Hernandez, M)
January 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER to continue 106 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION for ATTORNEY FEES , costs, and expenses from 2/19/2014 to 2/26/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/28/2014. (Hernandez, M)
December 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 104 JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL ACTION (CONSENT) in favor of Plaintiff Rosario Alonso and against Defendants Blackstone Financial Group, LLC and Jason Elsenon Plaintiffs claims for violation of the FDCPA and RFDCPA. Plaintiffis awarded $4,800.00 in damages according to the Memorandum of Decisionfiled on December 20, 2013. CASE CLOSED. (Gaumnitz, R)
October 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 87 AMENDED ORDER vacating motion in limine hearing. The motion in limine hearing set for 11/6/2013 is VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/30/2013. (Hernandez, M)
October 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER vacating motion in limine hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/30/2013. (Hernandez, M)
October 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER requiring defendants to file a response to plaintiff's request for modification of the pretrial order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/28/2013. (Hernandez, M)
October 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER requiring plaintiff to file a response to defendants' request for modification of the pretrial order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/16/2013. (Hernandez, M)
August 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 42 Defendant Elsen's Motion to Dismiss. Order denying 43 44 Defendants Blackstone and Elsen's Motions for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone on 8/2/2013. (Hernandez, M)
July 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Request to Seal Documents, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone on 7/22/13. (Hellings, J)
July 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER requiring parties to be prepared to address issue of emotional distress damages at July 24, 2013 hearing. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone on 7/23/2013. (Hernandez, M)
July 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Requiring Parties to Meet and Confer and Provide a Joint Statement of Undisputed Facts, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/15/2013. (IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall certify that they have met and conferred as r equired by the scheduling order and shall file a joint statement of undisputed facts by 4:00 p.m. on Friday, 7/19/2013. Should the parties fail comply with this order, the hearing date on the motions for summary judgment shall be vacated and a status conference set.)(Gaumnitz, R)
May 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER TO CONTINUE MOTION HEARING as to 42 MOTION to DISMISS, 44 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT: Motion Hearing is continued from 6/19/2013 to 7/24/2013 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone on 5/30/2013. (Hernandez, M)
May 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER (Doc. 45 ), Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone on 5/29/2013. (Arellano, S.)
February 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint 22 , 24 , 26 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone on 2/25/13: Defendant's cross-motion for a change of venue is DENIED; Amended Complaint due within fourteen (14) days from the date of service of this order.(Hellings, J)
February 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Directing Defendant to file a New Notice of Motion. Accordingly, defendant shall either 1) file a stipulation by the parties to hold the hearing on shortened time or 2) set a hearing date allowing proper notice for the motion on a Wednesday at 9:30 am. Defendant shall file and serve a new notice of motion for hearing on the motion to continue the trial date. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone on 2/7/2013. (Hernandez, M)
December 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER on 15 Stipulation to Continue Trial signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/17/2012. (Sant Agata, S)
November 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DISMISSING Defendant Steven Darwin re 6 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/8/2011. (Jessen, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alonso v. Blackstone Financial Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosario Alonso
Represented By: William M Krieg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackstone Financial Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?