Suarez v. Martel
Petitioner: Efrain Cazarez Suarez
Respondent: Mike Martel
Case Number: 1:2011cv01716
Filed: October 6, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Dismiss 1 Petition for Violation of the One-Year Statute of Limitations; ORDER Requiring Objections to be Filed within Twenty Days signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/17/2011. Referred to Judge O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 11/30/2011. (Flores, E)
October 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE why the Petition Should not be Dismissed for Violation of the One-Year Statute of Limitations; ORDER Requiring that a Response be Filed within Thirty Days signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/20/2011. Show Cause Response due by 11/23/2011. (Flores, E)
October 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER of INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:11-cv-2637 KJN) to Fresno (1:11-cv-1716 JLT) signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/13/11. (Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Suarez v. Martel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mike Martel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Efrain Cazarez Suarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?