Perez v. Bitter
Petitioner: Cesar Melgoza Perez
Respondent: M. D. Bitter
Case Number: 1:2011cv01766
Filed: October 24, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Stanislaus
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 41 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Dismiss in Part and Deny in Part the Second Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Doc. 22 ), Deny 37 Petitioner's Motions to Expand the Record and for an Evidentiary Hearing, to Enter Judgment for Respondent and to Decline to Issue a Certificate of Appealability signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/22/2014. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
February 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Deferring Consideration Of Petitioner's Motions For An Evidentiary Hearing And For Expansion Of The Record Until The Court Considers The Merits Of The Petition (Doc. 37 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/13/2013. (Fahrney, E)
March 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting Petitioner's 16 Motion to File a First Amended Petition to Withdraw his Unexhausted Claims; ORDER Deeming Petitioner's First Amended Petition Properly Filed; ORDER Granting Petitioner's 16 Motion for Stay of the Proceedings; ORDER Directing Petitioner to File Status Reports signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 03/28/2012. (Flores, E)
January 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DENYING 2 Petitioner's Motion to Stay the Petition Pursuant to Rhines v. Weber; ORDER GRANTING Petitioner Thirty (30) Days From the Date of Service of This Order to Withdraw Petitioner's Unexhausted Claims and Seek a Kelly Stay; INFORMATIONAL ORDER to Petitioner Concerning Dismissal if Unexhausted Claims Are Not Withdrawn, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/3/2012. (Marrujo, C)
November 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Dismiss 1 Petitioner's State Law Claims without Leave to Amend signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/14/2011. Referred to Judge O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 12/19/2011. (Flores, E)
October 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Denying Motion For Appointment Of Counsel (Doc. 3 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/26/2011. (Fahrney, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez v. Bitter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: M. D. Bitter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Cesar Melgoza Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?