Aaron McCoy v. Tann et al
Plaintiff: Aaron McCoy
Defendant: M. Tann, D. James, M. Jones, D. Plunkett, P. Paz, F. Jimenez, B. Hobbs, J. Oldan, Sullins and A. Wyckoff
Case Number: 1:2011cv01771
Filed: October 25, 2011
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER re Stipulation to Dismiss 98 signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/15/15. CASE CLOSED. (Verduzco, M)
June 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER AFTER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/5/2015. (Jessen, A)
May 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER GRANTING 92 Defendants' Ex Parte Application for Leave for CDCR Staff Counsel to Appear Telephonically at the June 5, 2015 Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/22/2015. (Hall, S)
April 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER DENYING 85 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 4/21/2015. (Jessen, A)
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 4/13/2015. Settlement Conference set for 6/5/2015 at 10:00 AM in Bakersfield at 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Jessen, A)
April 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER ADOPTING 82 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS IN FULL; ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 57 Defendants James, Jones and Paz's Motion for Summary Judgment; and ORDER GRANTING 60 Defendant Jimenez's Motion for Summary Judgment signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 4/7/2015. (Jessen, A)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 82 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to: (1) Grant in Part and Deny in Part Defendant James, Jones, and Paz's 57 Motion for Summary Judgment; and (2) Grant Defendant Jimenez's 60 Motion for Summary Judgment; Fourteen (14) Day Objection Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 3/19/2015. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Objections to F&R due by 4/6/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
July 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER (1) GRANTING 59 Defendant's Motion to Modify Scheduling Order; (2) DENYING 65 Plaintiff's Request to Postpone Consideration of Defendants' Summary Judgment Motions; and (3) GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 66 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel and to Postpone Consideration of Defendants' Summary Judgment Motions signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 6/30/2014. Response to Motions for Summary Judgment due within sixty (60) days. (Jessen, A)
September 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Adopting 50 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and DENYING Plaintiff's 23 Motion for Reconsideration signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/12/2013. (Sant Agata, S)
September 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Adopting 49 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and DENYING Defendant Jimenez's 30 Motion to Dismiss signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/10/2013. (Sant Agata, S)
August 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER DENYING 23 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 8/13/2013. (Sant Agata, S)
August 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Denying 23 Motion for Reconsideration signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 08/07/2013. Referred to Judge O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 8/26/2013. (Flores, E)
August 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 49 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 30 Defendant Jimenez's Motion to Dismiss be DENIED re 19 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 7/31/2013. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R due within fourteen (14) days. (Jessen, A)
June 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Denying 12 15 Motions for Legal Advice signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 06/27/2012. (Flores, E)
May 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DENYING 3 & 4 Plaintiff's Motions signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 5/21/2012. (Jessen, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aaron McCoy v. Tann et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Tann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Plunkett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Paz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. Jimenez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Oldan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sullins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Wyckoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?