Yolanda Gordillo et al v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: Yolanda Gordillo and Gabriel Preciado
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 1:2011cv01786
Filed: October 24, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Michael J Seng
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER to DISMISS and to CLOSE ACTION, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 9/22/2014. CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C)
September 18, 2014 Filing 53 STIPULATION Of Dismissal with Prejudice Pursuant to FRCP Rule 41(a) et seq. by Yolanda Gordillo, Gabriel Preciado. (Kavicky, Erika)
August 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MINUTE ORDER: (***TEXT ONLY***) The Parties are directed to file a Stipulation of Dismissal and Proposed Order. Please submit a copy of the Proposed Order to mjsorders@caed.uscourts.gov for review and approval by the Court, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 08/20/2014. (Yu, L)
August 18, 2014 Filing 51 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Yolanda Gordillo, Gabriel Preciado. (Kavicky, Erika)
June 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER GRANTING, in part, and DENYING, in part, plaintiff's Motion for Fees and Costs, document #44 . The Court awards plaintiff $44,189.75 in fees and $8,171.11 in costs. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 6/19/2014. (Rooney, M)
March 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MINUTE ORDER: (***TEXT ONLY***) The Motion Hearing on #44 Motion for Attorney Fees set for March 28, 2014 at 9:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng in Courtroom 6 (MJS) is taken off calendar. Motion is deemed submitted on the pleadings with a written Order to follow, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 03/25/2014. (Yu, L)
March 21, 2014 Filing 48 REPLY by Yolanda Gordillo, Gabriel Preciado re #46 Opposition to Motion, #44 MOTION for ATTORNEY FEES and Reimbursement of Costs and Expenses. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian J. Bickel)(Kavicky, Erika)
March 14, 2014 Filing 47 NOTICE of Errata to Table of Contents to Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Payment of Attorney's Fees and Reimbursment of Costs and Expenses by Ford Motor Company re #46 Opposition to Motion. (Efstratis, Harry)
March 14, 2014 Filing 46 OPPOSITION by Ford Motor Company to #44 MOTION for ATTORNEY FEES and Reimbursement of Costs and Expenses. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of H. Paul Efstratis, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Proof of Service)(Efstratis, Harry)
February 26, 2014 Filing 45 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information by All Plaintiffs. (Kavicky, Erika)
February 20, 2014 Filing 44 MOTION for ATTORNEY FEES and Reimbursement of Costs and Expenses by Yolanda Gordillo, Gabriel Preciado. Motion Hearing set for 3/28/2014 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6 (MJS) before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Erika N. Kavicky, #3 Proposed Order)(Kavicky, Erika)
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER GRANTING #42 EXTENSION TO FILE DISPOSITIONAL DOCUMENTS. Plaintiff shall file their motion for fees, costs and expenses on or before February 22, 2014, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 1/10/2014. (Yu, L)
January 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION TO FILE DISPOSITIONAL DOCUMENTS, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 1/7/2014. (Yu, L)
January 7, 2014 Filing 41 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to File Dispositional Documents by Yolanda Gordillo, Gabriel Preciado. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kavicky, Erika)
December 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER GRANTING the parties' request for an extension of time to 1/10/2014 to file dispositional documents. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 12/5/2013. (Rooney, M)
December 2, 2013 Filing 39 REQUEST for Extesion to File Notice of Dispositional Documents by Yolanda Gordillo, Gabriel Preciado. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kavicky, Erika)
October 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Order Vacating Pretrial Conference and Extending Time to File Dispositional Documents, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 10/16/2013. (Yu, L)
October 15, 2013 Filing 37 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extend Time to File Dispositional Documents and Continue the Pretrial Conference by Yolanda Gordillo, Gabriel Preciado. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kavicky, Erika)
September 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER to File Dispositive Documents Following Notice of Settlement re #35 Dispostive Documents to be Filed Within 30 days. The Pretrial Conference set for September 20, 2013 at 9:30 a.m. is CONTINUED to October 21, 2013 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6 (MJS) before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng. The Pretrial Conference and the Trial shall be vacated only if, prior to October 21, 2013, all dispositional documents have been filed with the Court or good cause is shown for an extenstion of time to do so , signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 09/18/2013. (Yu, L)
September 18, 2013 Filing 35 NOTICE of SETTLEMENT by Yolanda Gordillo, Gabriel Preciado. (Kavicky, Erika)
September 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Order DENYING the Parties joint request for a continuance of Pre-trial and Trial dates, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 09/13/2013. (Yu, L)
September 13, 2013 Filing 33 PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Plaintiffs Yolanda Gordillo, Gabriel Preciado.(Kavicky, Erika)
September 12, 2013 Filing 32 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for to Continue Trial Date and Pretrial Conference by Ford Motor Company. Attorney Efstratis, Harry Paul added. (Efstratis, Harry)
May 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Order Granting A Continuance Of Trial And Related Dates. The Pretrial Conference is now set for September 20, 2013 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6 (MJS) before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng. The Jury Trial is now set for October 22, 2013 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6 (MJS) before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng., signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 05/03/2013. (Yu, L)
April 24, 2013 Filing 30 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Continuance of Trial by Yolanda Gordillo, Gabriel Preciado. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Kavicky, Erika)
February 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY. Added attorney Joseph A. Whitecavage for Ford Motor Company as attorney of record in place of Kevin J. Tully, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 2/6/13. (Hellings, J)
February 5, 2013 Filing 28 SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by Ford Motor Company. (Tully, Kevin)
January 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING A CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL AND RELATED DATES Non-expert Discovery Cutoff: April 1, 2013. Expert Disclosures: April 1, 2013 and April 15, 2013. Expert Discovery Cutoff: May 14, 2013., Non-Dispositive Motions filed on or before May 16, 2013. Dispositive Motions filed on or before May 31, 2013., Pretrial Conference shall be held on June 21, 2013 at 9:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng in Courtroom 6 (MJS). Jury Trial shall commence on July 9, 2013 at 8:30 a.m before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng in Courtroom 6(MJS), signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 1/9/2013. (Yu, L)
January 8, 2013 Filing 26 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for a continuance of trial by Yolanda Gordillo, Gabriel Preciado. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Kavicky, Erika)
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING RELIEF FROM THE COURT's SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 11/13/2012. (Yu, L)
November 5, 2012 Filing 24 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for seeking relief from the court's scheduling order by Yolanda Gordillo, Gabriel Preciado. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Kavicky, Erika)
June 6, 2012 Filing 23 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS by Erika Nicolalde Kavicky. (Kavicky, Erika)
February 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER : Discovery Deadlines: Initial Disclosures: 2/24/2012, Expert Disclosures: Initial: 11/14/2012, Rebuttal: 11/28/2012., Discovery Cut Off: Non-Expert: 11/14/2012., Expert: 12/31/2012. Non-Dispositive Motions filed by 1/25/2013. Dispositive Motions filed by 1/25/2013, Pretrial Conference set for 4/5/2013 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6 (MJS) before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng. Jury Trial set for 4/23/2013 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (MJS) before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 2/27/2012. (Yu, L)
February 24, 2012 Filing 21 STATEMENT of Defendant Ford Motor Company's FRCP Rule 26 Initial Disclosure Statement by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Tully, Kevin)
February 16, 2012 Filing 20 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng: INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 2/16/2012. Court order to follow. Appearances of Counsel (telephonic): For Plaintiffs, Erika Nicolalde; For Defendant, Laura Malkofsky. Court Reporter/CD Number: In Chambers, Off the Record. (Arellano, S.)
January 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER ASSIGNING CASE re Presiding Judge, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/13/2012. New Case Number: 1:11-cv-01786-MJS. (Marrujo, C)
January 10, 2012 Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER: (***TEXT ONLY***)Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/26/2012 at 10:00 a.m. is MOVED to 2/16/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (MJS) before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng. si(Yu, L)
January 10, 2012 Filing 17 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Ford Motor Company. (Tully, Kevin)
January 10, 2012 Filing 16 JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT by Yolanda Gordillo, Gabriel Preciado. (Nicolalde, Erika)
January 10, 2012 Filing 15 STIPULATION TO ELECT REFERRAL OF ACTION TO VOLUNTARY DISPUTE RESOLUTION PROGRAM (VDRP) PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 271 by Yolanda Gordillo, Gabriel Preciado. (Nicolalde, Erika)
January 10, 2012 Filing 14 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Yolanda Gordillo, Gabriel Preciado. (Nicolalde, Erika)
December 16, 2011 Filing 13 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint by Ford Motor Company.(Tully, Kevin)
December 15, 2011 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE to Attorney Kevin Tully re #11 Amended Document: Your filing is entitled Amended Document, however, the actual document attached is Answer to Amended Complaint. Please re-file your document using the correct event Answers to Complaint found under the Initial Pleadings and Service category. If you need assistance, please contact the CM/ECF help desk at 866-884-5444, or refer to the CM/ECF User's Manual on the court's website. (Marrujo, C)
December 14, 2011 Filing 11 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Ford Motor Company: Amended #10 Answer to Amended Complaint. (Tully, Kevin)
November 28, 2011 Filing 10 FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint by Ford Motor Company. Attorney Tully, Kevin John added.(Tully, Kevin)
November 11, 2011 Filing 9 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ford Motor Company by Yolanda Gordillo, Gabriel Preciado.(Nicolalde, Erika)
November 11, 2011 Filing 8 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Erika Maritza Nicolalde on behalf of Yolanda Gordillo, Gabriel Preciado. Attorney Nicolalde, Erika Maritza added. (Nicolalde, Erika)
October 26, 2011 Filing 7 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ford Motor Company by Yolanda Gordillo, Gabriel Preciado.(Cline, Brian)
October 26, 2011 Filing 6 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/26/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (MJS) before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP Form) (Martin-Gill, S)
October 26, 2011 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Ford Motor Company* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Brian Kelly Cline* *The Brickel Law Firm, Inc.* *750 B Street, Suite 1950* *San Diego, CA 92101*. (Martin-Gill, S)
October 25, 2011 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE to attorney Brian Cline: Advance payment of the filing fee in the amount of $350.00 is required and should be submitted electronically using the event New Case Credit Card Payments. Your case will not be filed until the fee is paid (Local Rule 77-121c). If you wish to pay with cash, check or money order, the fee must be received by the clerk's office within 48 hours of lodging your complaint, or your documents will be deleted from the court's server. If you need assistance, please contact the CM/ECF help desk at 866-884-5444, or refer to the CM/ECF User's Manual on the court's website. (Sant Agata, S)
October 25, 2011 RECEIPT number CAE100016695 for $350.00 for Civil Filing Fee from Brian K Cline. (Lundstrom, T)
October 24, 2011 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Ford Motor Company by Yolanda Gordillo, Gabriel Preciado.(Cline, Brian)
October 24, 2011 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Yolanda Gordillo, Gabriel Preciado (Cline, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yolanda Gordillo et al v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolanda Gordillo
Represented By: Erika Nicolalde Kavicky
Represented By: Brian Cline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Preciado
Represented By: Brian Cline
Represented By: Erika Nicolalde Kavicky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Joseph A. Whitecavage
Represented By: Harry Paul Efstratis
Represented By: Kevin Tully
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?