J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. De La Cerda et al
Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions, Inc.
Defendant: Daniel De La Cerda, Erica De La Cerda and Daniel's Mexican Grill, LLC
Case Number: 1:2011cv01896
Filed: November 10, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47 U.S.C. ยง 553
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 43 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Plaintiff's 39 Motion For Costs and Attorneys' Fees Be Granted in Part and Denied in Part, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/10/2014. (Referred to District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 1/27/2014.) (Gaumnitz, R)
November 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER to Vacate Pretrial Conference and Trial, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/26/2013. (This Court VACATES the 12/5/2013 pretrial conference and 1/28/2014 trial and intends to close this action after a ruling on the pending attorney fees motion.)(Gaumnitz, R)
November 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER TO FILE STATUS REPORT signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on November 19, 2013. (Munoz, I)
October 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 SUMMARY JUDGMENT Decision and JUDGMENT, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/16/13. (Gonzalez, R)
September 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Granting 33 Stay as to Defendant Daniel's Mexican Grill, LLC signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 09/11/2013. (Flores, E)
March 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Granting 21 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record for Defendants signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 03/14/2013. Attorney Daniel Ralph Richardson terminated from Action.(Flores, E)
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER to SUPPLEMENT the Motion to Withdraw as Defendants' Attorney of Record. 1) No later than March 8, 2013, Mr. Richardson shall supplement his motion to withdraw as counsel by filing the following: a) A statement setting forth his cli ent's last known address; and b) A proof of service showing his clients were served with the motion to withdraw; 2) Upon reviewing the supplemental information to be filed by Mr. Richardson, the Court reserves the right to take the matter under submission without a hearing pursuant to Local Rule 230(g); and 3) If the Court elects to take the matter under submission, a minute order will be issued prior to March 13, 2013. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/5/2013. (Timken, A)
January 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER re SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/15/2013. (Timken, A)
December 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on December 22, 2011. (Munoz, I)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. De La Cerda et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Peter Riley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel De La Cerda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erica De La Cerda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel's Mexican Grill, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?