Silvester, et al. v. Harris, et al.

Plaintiff: Jeff Sylvester, Michael Poeschl, Brandon Combs, The Calguns Foundation, Inc. and The Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.
Defendant: Kamala D. Harris and California Department of Justice
Case Number: 1:2011cv02137
Filed: December 23, 2011
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Referring Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 17, 2014 136 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Plaintiffs' 108 Motion for Attorneys' Fees, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/17/2014. (IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. Plaintiffs motion for attorneys fees is GRANTED in the amount of 192,073.00; and 2. Plaintiffs motion for costs is GRANTED in the amount of $2,006.45 ($1,434.16 + $572.29).) (Gaumnitz, R)
December 3, 2014 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Permitting Plaintiffs to Submit Additional Evidence Regarding Attorney's Fees, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/3/2014. (IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. Plaintiffs will file supplemental briefing and evidence regarding attor neys fees for the time spent on post-trial motions and for the fee application as soon as possible, but no later than December 10, 2014; and 2. Defendant may file a response to Plaintiffs supplemental briefing within seven (7) days of service of Plaintiffs supplemental briefing and evidence.)(Gaumnitz, R)
November 20, 2014 123 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Defendant's 114 Motion to Stay and 110 Motion to Alter Judgment, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/20/2014. (IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. Defendant's motion to stay (Doc. No. 114) is DENIED; and 2. Defendant's motion to alter judgment (Doc. No. 110) is DENIED.) (Gaumnitz, R)
August 25, 2014 106 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS of FACT and CONCLUSIONS of LAW signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/22/2014. Judgment to be entered in favor of Plaintiff and against Defendant. (Status Conference set for 12/8/2014 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii). (Lundstrom, T)
August 12, 2014 103 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE to Parties Regarding Consideration of Laws and ORDER for Docket Correction, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/12/14. (Verduzco, M)
July 22, 2014 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Motion to File an Amicus Curiae Brief 101 , signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/22/14: Center's motion is DENIED. (Hellings, J)
March 21, 2014 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on stipulation regarding testimony of Alan Gottlieb signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/21/14. (Nazaroff, H)
March 12, 2014 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTIONS IN LIMINE (Docs. 51 , 53 , 54 , 55 , 56 ), Signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/12/2014. (Arellano, S.)
December 9, 2013 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment 31 , signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/6/13: Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. (Hellings, J)
October 24, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Vacating October 28, 2013 Hearing signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/23/2013. (Flores, E)
October 22, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER to Extend by One Day the Reply-Brief Deadline on Kamala Harris' Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 35 ), Signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/18/2013. Filing deadline: 10/22/2013. (Arellano, S.)
April 18, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION for Protective Order. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/18/2013. (Timken, A)
February 14, 2012 9 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER EXTENDING Defendants' time to respond to complaint. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/14/2012. (Timken, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Silvester, et al. v. Harris, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Sylvester
Represented By: Jason Andrew Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Poeschl
Represented By: Jason Andrew Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Combs
Represented By: Jason Andrew Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Calguns Foundation, Inc.
Represented By: Jason Andrew Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.
Represented By: Jason Andrew Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kamala D. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?