Castaneda v. Foston et al
Plaintiff: Jesus B. Castaneda
Defendant: D. Foston, C. Hammond, James A. Yates, R. H. Trimble, M. Sepulveda, Duenas, D. Bright, G. Ponder, D. Foreman and Nelson
Case Number: 1:2012cv00026
Filed: January 5, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER REGARDING In Forma Pauperis Status on Appeal, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/15/15. (Appeal No. 15-16386) (Marrujo, C)
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER Granting Defendants' Motion To Strike Plaintiff's Surreply (ECF No. 80 ), FINDINGS And RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Defendants' Motion To Dismiss (ECF No. 95 ), Thirty-Day Objection Deadline, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/30/2015. F&R's referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii; Objections to F&R due by 3/9/2015. (Fahrney, E)
October 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER ADOPTING 58 Findings and Recommendations Regarding Dismissal of Certain Claims and Defendants, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/2/2014. (Marrujo, C)
July 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER Granting 64 Plaintiff's Request for Copy of Findings and Recommendations 58 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/2/14. 21-Day Deadline. (Verduzco, M)
June 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to File Second Amended Complaint Lodged on May 19, 2014; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Dismissal of Certain Claims and Defendants signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 06/13/2014. Referred to Judge Ishii; Objections to F&R due by 6/30/2014. (Flores, E) (Main Document 58 replaced on 6/13/2014) (Flores, E).
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 40 Motion to File Objections to Magistrate Judge's Findings and Recommendations signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 02/10/2014. (Flores, E)
January 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Adopting 29 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Dismissal of Certain Claims and Defendants signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/2/2014. (Sant Agata, S)
November 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 34 Motion for Extension of Time to Fulfill Orders Issued by This Court on September 9, 2013; ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Serve Planitff With a Copy of the 30 Order Finding Service of Complaint Appropriate and Forward Documents to Plaintiff, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/20/2013. 30-Day Deadline. (Marrujo, C)
October 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER RE: Termination of Limited Appointment Counsel and Substitution of Plaintiff in Pro Per 15 ; ORDER DIRECTING Counsel to Submit Plaintiff's Current or Last Known Address Within 10 Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/23/13. (Hellings, J)
September 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Dismissal of Certain Claims and Defendants 28 THIRTY-DAY DEADLINE, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/6/13. (Hellings, J)
October 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ***PLEASE DISREGARD; duplicate entry***ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Motion To Continue (ECF No. 25 ), Thirty-Day Deadline, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/3/2012. (Motions filed by 11/5/2012) (Fahrney, E)
September 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion For A Temporary Restraining Order And Preliminary Injunction (ECF No. 7 ), signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/14/2012. (Fahrney, E)
June 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion For Leave To Amend And Motion For An Expedited Hearing (ECF No. 18 , 19 ), ORDER Striking First Amended Complaint (ECF Nos. 17 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/1/2012. (Fahrney, E)
April 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 13 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 04/04/2012. (Flores, E)
January 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DENYING Motion for Appointment of Counsel 11 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/31/12: Motion is DENIED without prejudice. (Hellings, J)
January 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Denying Motion For Appointment Of Counsel (ECF No. 3 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/9/2012. (Fahrney, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castaneda v. Foston et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus B. Castaneda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Foston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James A. Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. H. Trimble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Sepulveda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duenas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Bright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Ponder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Foreman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?