United States of America v. Combs

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Leroy D. Combs
Case Number: 1:2012cv00052
Filed: January 11, 2012
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Referring Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 12, 2012 23 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/11/2012. (Jessen, A)
December 5, 2012 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/5/2012 adopting 19 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and granting 15 Motion for Default Judgment.(Lundstrom, T)
October 30, 2012 19 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that the United States' Motion for Entry of Default Judgment, document 15 , be GRANTED. These findings are referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii with objections to same due within thirty days of service of this order; order signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 10/30/2012. (Rooney, M)
April 24, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 7 Motion to Extend Time for Service and ORDER CONTINUING Mandatory Scheduling Conferece, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 4/24/2012. Initial Scheduling Conference RESET for 10/10/2012 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 1 (SMS) before Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder. (Jessen, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Combs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Michael G. Pitman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leroy D. Combs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?