Wafford v. Gipson
Petitioner: Damien Wafford
Respondent: Connie Gipson
Case Number: 1:2012cv00122
Filed: January 10, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 59 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS REGARDING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS re 36 , 51 signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 3/3/2015. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Objections to F&R due within 14-Days. (Lundstrom, T).
December 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER GRANTING Withdrawal of Motion to Stay and GRANTING Motion to Substitute Respondent 48 , 49 , signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 12/22/14. (Hellings, J)
February 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Granting Motion For Extension Of Time (Doc. 25 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 2/6/2014. (Amended Complaint due by 2/24/2014)(Fahrney, E)
December 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING Petitioner's Motion for Reconsideration (Docs. 15 , 16 , 18 , 19 ) and RE-OPENING CASE; ORDER VACATING STAY and Ordering Petitioner to File an Amended Petition Containing Only Claims One and Two Within Thirty (30) Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 12/9/2013. (Jessen, A)
November 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DISMISSING PETITION Due to Petitioner's Failure to Follow a Court Order signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 11/20/2013. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
October 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE why stay should not be vacated signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 10/30/2013. Show Cause Response due by 11/18/2013.(Lundstrom, T)
September 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 9/18/2012 granting stay of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Case Stayed. (Case Management Deadline: 3/21/2013). (Lundstrom, T)
August 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Petition Should be Stayed, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 8/26/2012. Show Cause Response Due Within Fourteen (14) Days. (Marrujo, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wafford v. Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Damien Wafford
Represented By: Gregory Henrick Mitts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Connie Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?