Baker v. Yates
Plaintiff: Harvey Curtis Baker
Defendant: James A. Yates
Case Number: 1:2012cv00126
Filed: January 27, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Close Case signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 02/14/2017. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER Directing the Clerk of the Court to Seal Defendant's Exhibit A to her Motions In Limine signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 02/07/2017. (Flores, E)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER Requiring Defendant to File Exhibit A for her Motions In Limine no Later than February 8, 2017 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 02/06/2017. (Flores, E)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER Re-Captioning Case signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 01/12/2017. (Flores, E)
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 121 TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/2/2016. Telephonic Pre-Trial Confirmation Hearing set for 1/11/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone; Telephonic Motions In Limine Hearing set for 2/23/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone; Jury Trial set for 3/7/2017 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Sant Agata, S)
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER Setting Scheduling Hearing signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/18/2016. Scheduling Hearing set for 11/2/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone.(Flores, E)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER Regarding Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction; ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Send Consent Form to Parties signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 09/21/2016. (Flores, E)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER ADOPTING 110 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS IN FULL and ORDER DENYING 88 Defendant S. Moore's Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/15/2016. (Jessen, A)
August 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 110 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Denying Defendant's 88 Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 08/01/2016. Referred to Judge O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 9/6/2016. (Flores, E)
March 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER GRANTING IN PART, DENYING IN PART Plaintiff's 95 Motion to Compel Further Responses to Request for Production of Documents, and DENYING Plaintiff's Request for Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/1/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
November 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER requiring Defendants to Respond to 95 MOTION to COMPEL signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/2/2015. (Responses due by 11/13/2015). (Lundstrom, T)
October 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER re: 91 Motion Clarification; ORDERED that Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed on or before October 15, 2015, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/7/15. (Martin-Gill, S)
July 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER re Motions 82 & 86 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/30/2015. (Marrujo, C)
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 75 Motion for Subpoena Duces Tecum; ORDER Granting 76 Motion to Extend Discovery and Dispositive Motion Deadline; ORDER Denying 77 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 03/03/2015. Discovery Deadline due by 6/1/2015; Dispositive Motions filed by 7/31/2015. (Flores, E)
February 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER directing service of Defendant, S. Moore by U.S. Marshal Service signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/6/2014. (Lundstrom, T)
December 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER ADOPTING 65 Findings and Recommendations, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/9/2013. Motion 64 is Denied. (Marrujo, C)
November 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to Serve Defendant within Sixty (60) Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/1/13. (Verduzco, M)
July 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER ADOPTING 61 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 07/15/2013. (Flores, E)
June 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 61 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that Defendant James A. Yates be Dismissed from this 2 Action signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone on 06/04/2013. Referred to Judge O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 7/8/2013. (Flores, E)
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Adopting FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS (ECF No. 53 ), signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/15/2013. (Fahrney, E)
April 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 55 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that Defendant's 53 Motion to Dismiss be Denied as Moot signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone on 04/09/2013. Referred to Judge O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 5/13/2013. (Flores, E)
April 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER SCREENING Plaintiff's Complaint and Requiring Plaintiff Either to File Amended Complaint or to Notify Court of Willingness to Proceed only on Claims Identified Herein signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone on 04/08/2013. Amended Complaint due by 5/13/2013. (Flores, E)
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER ADOPTING 41 & 42 Findings and Recommendations, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/4/2013. Plaintiff is granted leave to file an amended complaint within thirty (30) days. (Marrujo, C)
February 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Denying Motions (ECF No. 44 , 45 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone on 2/15/2013. (Fahrney, E)
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Re Plaintiff's Filing (ECF No. 34 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone on 2/11/2013. Plaintiff's request/motion is DENIED. (Fahrney, E)
February 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 AMENDED FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Be Denied 8 OBJECTIONS DUE WITHIN 21 DAYS, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone on 2/5/13: Matter referred to District Judge O'Neill. (Hellings, J)
February 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 FINDINGS And RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending That Defendant's Motion To Dismiss Be Denied (ECF No. 8 ), Objections Due Within 21 Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone on 2/5/2013. F&R's referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 2/28/2013. (Fahrney, E)
August 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Denying 28 Motion for Third Party to be Placed on Service List of the Court, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 8/21/12. (Gonzalez, R)
June 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 6/19/2012, VACATING June 25, 2012 Scheduling Conference Under Local Rule 240(c)(8). (Marrujo, C)
June 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER re: Defendant's request for extension of time to reply to Plaintiff's untimely opposition to 8 Motion to Dismiss and for ORDER VACATING Hearing date, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 6/6/2012. (Kusamura, W) Modified on 6/7/2012 (Kusamura, W).
April 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting Request to Reset Motion to Dismiss, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 4/10/2012. ( 8 Motion to Dismiss previously set for 4/19/2012 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill WILL NOW BE HEARD on 6/15/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (DLB) before Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck.) (Gaumnitz, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harvey Curtis Baker
Represented By: Peter Manuel Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James A. Yates
Represented By: William J. Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?