Cejas v. Myers, et al.
Plaintiff: Andrew A. Cejas
Defendant: W. K. Myers and James A. Yates
Case Number: 1:2012cv00271
Filed: February 24, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Gerald B. Cohn
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER ADOPTING 174 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and Granting 132 Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by Defendants Myers, Trimble, McGee and Fisher signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 06/16/2016. (Flores, E)
April 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 175 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that the 135 Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by Defendants Foston, Pimentel and Van Leer be Granted signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 4/27/2016. Referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Objections to F&R due by 5/31/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 174 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 132 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment be GRANTED and that Judgment be Entered in Their Favor re 51 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 4/19/2016. Referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
March 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER DENYING 162 Plaintiff's Motion to Join Oppositions signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 3/30/2016. (Jessen, A)
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 139 Motion to Compel copy of his Deposition Transcript signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 3/5/2016. (Lundstrom, T)
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER denying 144 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 2/1/2016. (Lundstrom, T)
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER REGARDING Plaintiff's 140 Objections to Defendants' Request to Supplement Motion signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 1/26/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
January 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER on Defendants D. Foston, R. Pimentel and D. Van Leer's Request to Supplement Record in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 1/15/16. (Marrujo, C)
December 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's 122 Motion to Compel Defendant McGee to Provide Further Responses to Interrogatories, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 12/14/15. (Verduzco, M)
December 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER granting 127 Motion to modify Discovery and Scheduling Order signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 12/9/2015. (Dispositive Motions: filing ddl: 1/11/2016).(Lundstrom, T)
November 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER disregarding 124 Motion to Compel signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 11/18/2015. (Lundstrom, T)
November 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER [119-1]; ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO FILE PAGES 2-13 OF DOCUMENT 119 AS MOTION TO COMPEL [119-2] signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 11/4/2015. (Lundstrom, T)
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 104 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendant Pimentel to Provide Further Responses to Interrogatories signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 10/5/2015. Responses due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
June 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER striking Plaintiff's Reply to Answer 76 signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 6/9/2015. (Lundstrom, T)
June 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER striking Plaintiff's Replies to Answers re 73 and 74 signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 6/8/2015. (Lundstrom, T)
June 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER STRIKING 71 Plaintiff's Reply to Answer signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 6/3/2015. (Jessen, A)
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER STRIKING 68 and 69 Plaintiff's Replies to Answers signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 6/2/2015. (Jessen, A)
May 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER STRIKING PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO ANSWER 66 signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 5/27/2015. (Lundstrom, T)
April 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER ADOPTING 52 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS and DISMISSING Certain Claims signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/9/2015. Defendants shall file a responsive pleading within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
January 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 52 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that this Action Go Forward on Plaintiff's First Amendment Claim, That His Equal Protection Claim be DISMISSED Without Leave to Amend, and that Defendants File a Responsive Pleading Within Thirty Days of the Adoption of These Findings and Recommendations re 51 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 1/27/2015. Referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
November 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER adopting 44 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; granting in part and denying in part 23 Motion to Dismiss and denying Motion for More Definite Statement as moot signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/13/2014. (Lundstrom, T)
September 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 23 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Motion for a More Definite Statement be GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART re 16 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 9/10/2014. Referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
August 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Granting Defendants' Motion To Strike Sur-Reply (Document 35 ), ORDER Striking Plaintiff's Sur-Reply (Document 34 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 8/25/2014. (Fahrney, E)
May 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting 8 Motion to Amend the Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald B. Cohn on 5/7/2012. Amended Complaint due by 6/11/2012. (Lundstrom, T)
April 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER STRIKING 1 Complaint as Unsigned, signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald B. Cohn on 4/17/2012. Signed complaint due in fourteen (14) days. (Jessen, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cejas v. Myers, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew A. Cejas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. K. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James A. Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?