Kleinau v. Citizens Business Bank
Plaintiff: Gail Kleinau
Defendant: Citizens Business Bank
Case Number: 1:2012cv00276
Filed: February 23, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION For Dismissal, ORDER, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/19/2013. CASE CLOSED. (Fahrney, E)
July 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER AFTER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/9/2013. (Hall, S)
June 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING Stipulation Setting a Settlement Conference re 14 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/12/2013. Settlement Conference SET for 7/9/2013 at 10:00 AM at the United States Courthouse, 510 19th Street (JLT), Bakersfield, before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kleinau v. Citizens Business Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail Kleinau
Represented By: Randall Martin Rumph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citizens Business Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?