Delgado v. Gonzalez et al
Plaintiff: Alezander Delgado
Defendant: Gonzalez, K. Allison, D. Ibarra, T. Akin, Carnales, Plata, R. Quintana, Diaz, Hopkins, Villasenor and Morris
Case Number: 1:2012cv00319
Filed: March 2, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Gerald B. Cohn
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION to Grant Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment 57 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/15/2018: 21-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER STRIKING 64 Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Answer signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/8/2017. (Jessen, A)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER DENYING 59 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/7/2017. (Jessen, A)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 SECOND INFORMATIONAL ORDER - NOTICE and Warning of Requirements for Opposing Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; Twenty-One (21) Day Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/16/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER After Appeal and WITHDRAWING Discovery and Scheduling Order 49 , 50 , 51 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 05/02/2017. (Responses due 21-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER DENYING 47 Motion for Alternative Dispute Resolution, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 11/30/2015. (Martin-Gill, S)
February 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's In Forma Pauperis Status on Appeal re 44 USCA Order, 42 Notice of Appeal, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 02/05/15. (Gonzalez, R)
January 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 40 Motion for Relief from Judgment, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/8/15. (Verduzco, M)
October 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss be GRANTED re 29 MOTION to DISMISS filed by Gonzalez ; referred to Judge Ishii,signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 10/15/14. Objections to F&R due by 11/17/2014 (Martin-Gill, S)
March 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER ADOPTING 14 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and DISMISSING Certain Claims and All Defendants except Gonzalez, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 03/25/2014. (Carnales, Diaz, Hopkins, D. Ibarra, Morris, Plata, R. Quintana, Villasenor, T. Akin and K. Allison terminated) (Martin-Gill, S)
November 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Disregarding Plaintiff's 16 Motion Requesting Defendants to Answer Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 11/21/13. (Gonzalez, R)
November 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Dismissal of Certain Claims and Certain Defendants, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 11/13/13. Referred to Judge Ishii. Thirty-Day Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
November 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DENYING 8 9 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald B. Cohn on 11/20/2012. (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Delgado v. Gonzalez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alezander Delgado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Ibarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Akin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carnales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Quintana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Villasenor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?