Jones v. Lehigh Southwest Cement Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: William Ray Jones, Sr.
Defendant: Lehigh Southwest Cement Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2012cv00633
Filed: April 20, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Labor/Management Relations
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER on 107 Order to Show Cause and ORDER Forbidding Filings or Communication, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/20/2015. (Rooney, M)
July 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER To SHOW CAUSE And For Personal Appearance Of William Ray Jones, Sr. And Helene Jones, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/9/2015. Show Cause Hearing set for 7/20/2015 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Fahrney, E)
June 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER DENYING plaintiff's second motion for relief from judgment, document 104 . Order signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/30/2015. (Rooney, M)
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER on Plaintiff's Motion for Relief of Judgment, Order and Bill of Cost From Defendants" (Docs. 97 and 102 , signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/30/2014. (It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs motion for relief from judgment pursuant to Rule 60(b) is DENIED. The case shall remain CLOSED.) (Gaumnitz, R)
July 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER vacating hearing date of July 28, 2014 and taking matter under submission signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/25/14. (Nazaroff, H)
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 95 INFORMATIONAL ORDER Regarding Entry of Judgment, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/27/2014. (Marrujo, C)
May 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 94 AMENDED JUDGMENT In a Civil Case Pursuant to Order. (Marrujo, C)
May 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER Granting Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment 86 , signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/15/14. CASE CLOSED. (Verduzco, M)
April 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER vacating hearing date of April 7, 2014 and taking matter under submission. signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/2/14. (Nazaroff, H)
January 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motions to Compel Production of Documents and to Compel Defendant to Complete Depositions 76 79 ; ORDER GRANTING IN PART Defendant's Motion for Sanctions 77 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1 /30/2014. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline for Defendant Only: 2/28/2014. Pretrial Conference CONTINUED to 6/25/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Jury Trial CONTINUED to 8/19/2014 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Hall, S)
August 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER DISREGARDING the Request for Review of Security Film re 70 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/19/2013. (Hall, S)
August 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER DISCHARGING Order to Show Cause re 64 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/5/2013. (Hall, S)
July 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why This Matter Should Not Be Consolidated, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/11/2013. Show Cause Response due by 8/2/2013. (Hall, S)
June 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Memorandum Opinion And ORDER On Defendant's Motion To Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint (Doc. 46 ), signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/12/2013. (Fahrney, E)
January 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER VACATING Hearing Date of February 4, 2013, and GRANTING 53 30-Day Continuation of Date of Submission of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/30/2013. (Marrujo, C)
January 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis 20 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/4/2013. (Hall, S)
November 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (Doc. 31), Signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/27/2012. Any amended complaint shall be filed and served not later than twenty-one (21) days from the date of service of this order. Should Plaintiff not file any amended complaint within the time period allotted, Defendant shall so notify the court and move for dismissal of the action and entry of judgment. (Arellano, S.)
October 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER vacating hearing date of October 15, 2012 and taking matter under submission (Nazaroff, H)
August 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Construing Motion to Amend as the First Amended Complaint 29 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/22/2012. (Hall, S)
July 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING Lehigh's 7 Motion to Dismiss with Leave to Amend, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/18/2012. Amended Complaint due by 8/20/2012. (Figueroa, O)
May 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER vacating hearing date of June 4, 2012 and taking matter under submission. signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/31/12. (Nazaroff, H)
May 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion to Remand 11 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on May 22, 2012. (Hall, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Lehigh Southwest Cement Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lehigh Southwest Cement Company, Inc.
Represented By: Susan K. Hatmaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Ray Jones, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?