Everett v. Brazelton
Plaintiff: Ronald Everett
Defendant: Brazelton
Case Number: 1:2012cv00680
Filed: April 11, 2012
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER regarding Plaintiff's Objection to the Court's Order Dismissing this action and DENYING 33 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/15/2016. (Martin-Gill, S)
January 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER DISMISSING Action without Prejudice for Failure to State a Claim, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/28/16. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
June 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER DENYING 28 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 06/11/2015. (Martin-Gill, S)
April 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Regarding 22 Motion for Legal Status on In Forma Pauperis, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/1/15. (Martin-Gill, S)
September 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT Without Leave To Amend For Failure To State A Claim (ECF Nos. 1 , 10 ), ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Request For A Copy Of His Original Complaint And Exhibits (ECF No. 11 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/9/2013. CASE CLOSED.(Fahrney, E)
April 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER of INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:12-cv-0945 GGH) to Fresno (1:12-cv-0680 BAM) signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 4/30/12. (Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Everett v. Brazelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Everett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brazelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?