Lewis v. Alison et al
Plaintiff: Homer Tyrone Lewis
Defendant: Kathleen Alison, Derral G. Adams, Maurice Junious, P. Denny, G. Parra and R. Garza
Case Number: 1:2012cv00856
Filed: May 25, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER DISMISSING Action With Prejudice 115 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/24/15: Pursuant to the parties' stipulation, this action is DISMISSED in its entirety with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (CASE CLOSED)(Hellings, J)
August 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER DIRECTING Defendants to File Report Regarding Status of the Settlement Agreement, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 7/31/2015. Status Report Due: 8/7/15. (Marrujo, C)
April 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 102 Application to Modify Scheduling Order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/10/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
April 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Referral of this Case to the Pro Se Prisoner Settlement Program 98 ; ORDER Setting Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/31/15. Settlement Conference set for 6/5/2015 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (MJS) before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng. (Verduzco, M)
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 95 Request for Deposition of Defendant P. Denny and Former Defendant R. Garza signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 03/06/2015. (Flores, E)
January 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 61 Motion to Compel Production of Documents, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 01/21/15. (Gonzalez, R)
January 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER Adopting FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Defendants' Motion For Summary Judgment For Failure To Exhaust Administrative Remedies (ECF Nos. 58 , 84 ), signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/20/2015. (Fahrney, E)
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER GRANTING Defendant Allison's 91 Request for Extension of Time to Respond to Interrogatories and Requests for Document Production, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/6/15. Sixty-Day Deadline. (Marrujo, C)
December 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER Granting 89 Motion for Stipulated Modification of May 1, 2014 Discovery and Scheduling Order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/19/2014. Dispositive Motions filed by 6/10/2015. (Flores, E)
December 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER STRIKING Plaintiff's 86 Reply to Defendant Allison's Answer, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/15/2014. (Marrujo, C)
December 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 84 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/8/2014 regarding 58 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 1/12/2015. (Lundstrom, T)
November 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER Directing Defendant Allison to File Responsive Pleading signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/07/2014. (Flores, E)
November 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER ADOPTING 57 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding 33 Motion to Dismiss signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/06/2014. R. Garza (Correctional Officer) and G. Parra (Correctional Officer) terminated. (Flores, E)
October 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER Granting Defendants' 76 Request for Extension of Time to Respond to Request for Admissions signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/16/2014. (Flores, E)
July 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 57 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Defendants' 33 Motion to Dismiss signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 07/28/2014. Referred to Judge O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 9/2/2014. (Flores, E)
June 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Adopting Findings and Recommendations 45 Regarding Denial of Motion for Emergency Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction 44 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 6/27/14. (Verduzco, M)
June 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 45 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 44 Plaintiff's Motion for Emergency Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction be DENIED With Prejudice for Lack of Jurisdiction re 21 Third Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/5/2014. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R due within fourteen (14) days. (Jessen, A)
April 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Denying 28 Plaintiff's Request for Entry of Default; ORDER Granting Defendants' Motion for 45-Day Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading 30 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/17/14. (Verduzco, M)
January 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER ADOPTING 22 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Dismissal of Certain Claims signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 01/21/2014. (Flores, E)
December 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Dismissal of Certain Claims, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/10/2013, referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R Due Within Thirty Days. (Marrujo, C)
September 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING 14 Motion to Amend the Complaint and DIRECTING Clerk of Court to File Lodged Second Amended Complaint 13 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 09/6/2013. (Martin-Gill, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Alison et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Homer Tyrone Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Alison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derral G. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maurice Junious
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Denny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Parra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Garza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?