James White v. Pazin et al
Plaintiff: James E. White
Defendant: Mark N. Pazin, Merced County Sheriff's Department Administration, Blake, Tom Cavallero, Joe Scott, Thoreson and Blodgett
Case Number: 1:2012cv00917
Filed: June 6, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Merced
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER Denying 84 Motion to Appoint Counsel as Moot, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/18/19. (Gonzalez, R)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER GRANTING 72 Motion for Summary Judgment; ORDERED Judgment In Favor of Defendant and Against Plaintiff; ORDER DIRECTING the Clerk of the Court to Close this Case, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 03/29/19.CASE CLOSED (Martin-Gill, S)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Amend 65 ; ORDER Granting Motion to Modify Scheduling Order 66 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/12/17. Amended Complaint Due Within Fourteen Days. (Gonzalez, R)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER Requiring Defendant to File Opposition or Statement of Non-Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend and Motion to Modify Scheduling Order 65 and 66 ;ORDER VACATING October 27, 2017, Hearing Date,signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/02/2017. (Martin-Gill, S)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER to recaption case signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/10/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS to GRANT IN PART and DENY IN PART Defendants' 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss 30 , 42 , signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/16/17: This action is referred back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings consistent with this order. (Hellings, J)
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Requiring Defendants Pazin, Merced County Sheriff's Administration, Blake, Cavallero, Scott, Thoreson, and Blodgett to Reimburse United States Marshal Within Thirty (30) Days 29 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/17/16. (Hellings, J)
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Overruling Objections to Request for Reimbursement by USM, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/31/16. (Verduzco, M)
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Grant in Part and Deny in Part Defendants' 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss 30 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/19/16. Case assigned to District Judge Anthony W. Ishii and Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. New Case Number: 1:12-cv-00917-AWI-BAM (PC). Referred to Judge Ishii; 30-Day Deadline. (Verduzco, M)
August 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to File Opposition or Statement of Non-Opposition within Twenty-One Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/1/15. (Verduzco, M)
June 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S REQUESTS FOR STATUS REPORT ON WHETHER US MARSHAL HAS COMPLETED SERVICE ON DEFENDANTS re 26 , 27 signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/25/2015. (Lundstrom, T)
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Regarding In Forma Pauperis Status on Appeal, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/13/2014. (cc: Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals.) (Marrujo, C)
December 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DISMISSING Action With Prejudice for Failure to State a Claim 12 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/5/13: This terminates the action in its entirety. (CASE CLOSED)(Hellings, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James White v. Pazin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James E. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark N. Pazin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merced County Sheriff's Department Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Cavallero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thoreson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blodgett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?