Gibson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Beverly Jean Gibson
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2012cv00945
Filed: June 11, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 416
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DISMISSING the Action for Plaintiff's Failure to Comply with the Court's Orders and Failure to Prosecute signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/30/2012. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
October 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SECOND ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Comply with the Instructions for Service of Social Security Appeals signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 09/28/2012. (Flores, E)
September 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER to PLAINTIFF to SHOW CAUSE Why the Action Should Not Be Dismissed for Failure to Comply With the Court's Orders, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/24/2012. Show Cause Response due by 10/9/2012.(Hall, S)
August 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DIRECTING Plaintiff to Comply with the Instructions for Service of Social Security Appeals, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/28/2012. (Hall, S)
July 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DIRECTING Plaintiff to Comply with the Instructions for Service of Social Security Appeals, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/20/2012. (Hall, S)
July 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk to Issue Summons; ORDER DIRECTING United States Marshal for Service of Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/2/12. (Hellings, J)
June 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Motions to Proceed in Forma Paupers 2 3 and ORDER DISMISSING Complaint with Leave to Amend, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/15/2012. (Hall, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gibson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Jean Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?