Ortiz v. Georgia Pacific
Plaintiff: Jose A. Ortiz
Defendant: Georgia Pacific
Case Number: 1:2012cv01033
Filed: June 26, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Stanislaus
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER DISMISSING CASE signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/10/2014. CASE CLOSED.(Lundstrom, T)
December 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER After Settlement (Doc. 61 ), signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/5/2013.(Case Management Deadline: 1/10/2014) (Fahrney, E)
September 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 41 signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on September 23, 2013. (Munoz, I)
December 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/19/2012. (Martinez, A)
September 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SECOND INFORMATIONAL ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/24/2012. (Bradley, A)
August 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 INFORMATIONAL ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 8/10/2012. (Lundstrom, T)
July 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Application To Proceed Without Prepayment Of Fees Filed July 23, 2012 (Document 9 ), signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 7/25/2012. Plaintiff is advised that in order to proceed with his action in this Court, he must pay a filing fee of $350 (see 28 U.S.C. § 1914) no later than August 15, 2012. (Fahrney, E)
July 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 5 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 7/12/2012. (Bradley, A)
July 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AMENDED ORDER re 3 Order denying Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 7/3/2012. Case Management Deadline: 7/30/2012 for submission of $350.00 filing fee.(Lundstrom, T)
July 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ; denying 2 Motion to Proceed IFP; ORDER Requiring Submission of Filing Fee within 30 days, or no later than March 15, 2012. signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 7/2/20112. (Kusamura, W)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ortiz v. Georgia Pacific
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose A. Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia Pacific
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?