Polk v. Lattimore et al
Plaintiff: Susan Mae Polk
Defendant: Mary Lattimore, L. Hunter, V. H. Cambridge, M. J. Rhodes, K. Foster, J. Pimentel, C. Amezquita, W. B. Harding, W. S. Jandro and W. Terry
Case Number: 1:2012cv01156
Filed: July 16, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Madera
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 161 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS regarding Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment for failure to exhaust administrative remedies 147 signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/24/2022. Referred to Judge Dale A. Drozd; Objections to F&R due within 14-Days. (Lundstrom, T)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER GRANTING IN PART Defendant's 153 MOTION to Extend the Time to Conduct Discovery Pending the Court's Ruling on Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment Based on Exhaustion signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/25/2021. (Sant Agata, S)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER Requiring Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's 149 Motion for Extension of Time to Oppose Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 08/10/2021. Opposition Deadline: 8/30/2021.(Flores, E)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER clarifying deadline to file Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment 147 signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/2/2021. Filing Deadline: 8/16/2021. (Lundstrom, T)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER DENYING 140 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 05/19/2021. (Maldonado, C)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER Disregarding Defendant's 138 Opposition signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 04/16/2021.(Flores, E)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 133 Motion for Reconsideration signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/26/2021. (Lundstrom, T)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER ADOPTING 120 Findings and Recommendations; ORDERED that this action shall proceed only on Plaintiff's Fifth Amended Complaint against Defendant Baron, all other claims are dismissed; ORDERED that this action be referred back to the Magis trate Judge for proceedings, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 12/3/2020. (K. Foster, W. B. Harding, L. Hunter, W. S. Jandro, Mary Lattimore, J. Pimentel, M. J. Rhodes, W. Terry, C. Amezquita and V. H. Cambridge terminated) (Martin-Gill, S)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 120 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Dismissal of Certain Claims, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/7/2020. Objections to F&R due within FOURTEEN DAYS. (Marrujo, C)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER STRIKING as Duplicative 116 Fifth Amended Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/21/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER adopting in part 102 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS. ORDER granting leave to file Fifth Amended Complaint on a single claim within 30-Days. Signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/5/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER Regarding 111 Motion for a Ruling on Bill of Costs Dated March 2, 2018, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/31/18. (Marrujo, C)
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 102 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that Dismissal of Action for Failure to State a Claim and Failure to Comply with Rule 8 and 18 signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 05/10/2018. Referred to Judge Drozd; Objections to F&R due by 5/29/2018. (Flores, E)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 91 Motions for Relief from Final Judgment signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/11/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER Granting in part and denying in part 96 Motion for Copy of Record on Appeal Pursuant to Ninth Circuit Rule 30-3 signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 06/05/2017. (Flores, E)
June 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER Granting Plaintiff an Extension of Time to July 18, 2016, in which to File Objections signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 05/31/2016. (Flores, E)
May 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 76 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS that this Action be Dismissed for Failure to State a Claim and Failure to Comply with Rule 8 and 18 signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 05/03/2016. Referred to Judge Drozd; Objections to F&R due by 5/23/2016.(Flores, E)
September 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 71 Motion to Correct Order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 09/09/2015. (Flores, E)
April 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER Denying 63 Motion for Reconsideration signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 04/21/2015. (Flores, E)
April 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 62 Motion to Stay; Thirty Day Deadline to File Fourth Amended Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/15/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
April 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER REQUIRING Plaintiff to File Fourth Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/6/15. Thirty Day Deadline. (Marrujo, C)
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER Granting Motion for Stay 56 ; ORDER Staying the Proceedings in this Action Until Resolution of Plaintiff's Objections, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/23/15. Case Stayed. (Verduzco, M)
February 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Denying Motion For Reconsideration (Doc. 52 ; also resolves Doc. 51 ), ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Fourth Motion For Extension Of Time To File Fourth Amended Complaint (Doc. 50 ), DEADLINE: February 27, 2015, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/4/2015. (Fourth Amended Complaint due by 2/27/2015) (Fahrney, E)
July 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Denying 43 Motion to Stay; ORDER Denying Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief; ORDER Granting 43 Motion for Extension of Time signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 07/25/2014. Amended Complaint due by 9/29/2014. (Flores, E)
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 17 ; ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief 11 , signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/14/14. (Hellings, J)
March 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER RE Plaintiff's Objections to Magistrate Judge's Order Under Rule 72 27 , signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/12/14. (Hellings, J)
January 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 38 Request for Judicial Notice signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/2/2014. (Sant Agata, S)
December 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Striking 35 Appendix to Third Amended Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/11/2013. (Flores, E)
November 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Waive 25 Page Limit 30 ; ORDER Striking Second Amended Complaint, with Leave to Amend 28 ; ORDER resolving Motion 29 for extension of time, Thirty Day Deadline to File Third Amended Complaint Not Exceeding 25 Pages, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 11/14/13. (Verduzco, M)
October 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER DENYING Motion for Reconsideration 24 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/23/13: Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration, filed on October 21, 2013, is DENIED. (Hellings, J)
September 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Granting 18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to Magistrate Judge's Findings and Recommendations Nunc Pro Tunc signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 09/19/2013. (Flores, E)
July 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that Plaintiff's 11 Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief be Denied signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 07/18/2013. Referred to Judge Ishii; Objections to F&R due by 8/20/2013. (Flores, E)
February 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Re Plaintiff's Notice Of Incorrect Date (Doc. 14 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/13/2013. (Fahrney, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Polk v. Lattimore et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Mae Polk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Lattimore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V. H. Cambridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. J. Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Pimentel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Amezquita
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. B. Harding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. S. Jandro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?