Hawker et al v. BancInsurance, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Thomas T. Hawker, Dave Kraechan, John J. Incandela, Edwin Jay Lee and Edward J. Rocha
Defendant: BancInsurance, Inc. and Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Case Number: 1:2012cv01261
Filed: August 1, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Merced
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER DIRECTING CLERK OF COURT TO CLOSE CASE AND ADJUST DOCKET TO REFLECT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL re 170 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/7/2017. CASE CLOSED. (Lundstrom, T)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 169 STIPULATION and ORDER to continue Status Conference from 5/26/2017 to 6/30/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/24/2017. (Hernandez, M)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 167 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING May 5, 2017 STATUS CONFERENCE to May 26, 2017,signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 04/28/2017. (Status Conference set for 5/26/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone) (Martin-Gill, S)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE FOR MAY 5, 2017 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/19/2017. This action is HEREBY set for Status Conference on 5/5/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. The parties shall file a joint status report seven (7) days prior to the status conference addressing the claims and parties that remain in this action following the decision on the FDICs appeal. (Valdez, E)
April 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER GRANTING 155 Motion for Certification of Judgment as Final and Appealable, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/17/2015. (Kusamura, W)
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER GRANTING 149 Motion to Substitute signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/16/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
February 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTION TO CERTIFY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/27/2015. (Hernandez, M)
January 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER LIFTING STAY signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/26/2015. Status Conference set for 2/27/2015 at 02:45 PM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. Status Report due by 2/23/2015. (Jessen, A)
December 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER to continue the Status Conference from 12/30/2014 to 1/26/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/29/2014. (Hernandez, M)
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER to continue Status Conference from 11/20/2014 to 12/30/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/14/2014. (Hernandez, M)
July 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER GRANTING 134 Motion for Certification of Judgment as Final and Appealable. The Court VACATES the hearing set for 7/18/2014 before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/15/2014. (Hernandez, M)
June 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER after status conference. The parties shall file their motion on or before 6/20/2014, whether it is filed jointly or otherwise; opposition due on or before 7/9/2014; Reply due on or before 7/16/2014; Hearing shall be set on 7/18/2014 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/6/2014. (Hernandez, M)
April 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 127 STIPULATION and ORDER to continue Scheduling Conference from 5/6/2014 to 5/27/2014 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. A joint scheduling conference report is due one week before the new conference date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/29/2014. (Hernandez, M)
April 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER GRANTING BANCINSURE'S 74 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DENYING THE FDIC'S 76 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. BancInsure's motion to strike evidence from the record is denied as moot 105 . Summary Judgment is granted in favor of BancInsure and against the FDIC with respect to the FDIC's second claim for relief for breach of contract. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/7/2014. (Hernandez, M)
March 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 109 JOINT APPLICATION AND ORDER ADDRESSING EXCESS PAGE LIMIT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/19/2014. (Hernandez, M)
February 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 90 STIPULATION and FOURTH AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER - Phase I Opposition filing deadline due 3/7/2014; Phase I Reply filing deadline due 3/26/2014; Phase I Motion Hearing 4/2/2014; Further Case Management Conference set for 4/18/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/21/2014. (Hernandez, M)
December 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 61 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. Defendant shall produce any responsive documents within 30 days from the date of service of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/27/2013. (Hernandez, M)
December 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 72 STIPULATION AND THIRD AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER - Phase I Discovery Completion due by 1/24/2014; Phase I Motion Filing Deadline 1/31/2014; Phase I Opposition Filing Deadline 2/21/2014; Phase I Reply Filing Deadline 3/5/2014; Phase I Motion Hearing 3/12/2014. Further Case Management Conference March 28, 2014 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/19/2013. (Hernandez, M)
November 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 59 STIPULATION and SECOND Amended Scheduling Order: The parties stipulate to and respectfully request that the Court issue a Second Amended Scheduling Order that amends the following dates and deadlines in this matter: Phase I Discovery Completion 12/ 13/2013; Phase I Motion Filing Deadline 12/20/2013; Phase I Opposition Filing Deadline 1/17/2014; Phase I Reply Filing Deadline 1/29/2014; Phase I Motion Hearing set for 2/19/2014 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Bo one; Further Case Management Conference continued to 3/14/2014 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. The parties further stipulate that the trial date shall remain the same. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/13/2013. (Hernandez, M)
September 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 AMENDMENT TO STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER -Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/24/2013. (Hernandez, M)
September 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER re 52 Notice of Withdrawal of ECF Document signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/5/2013. Document 51 Notice of Appearance is hereby ordered withdrawn. (Jessen, A)
August 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER, Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/29/2013: Phase I Discovery Completion- 11/15/2013; Phase I Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline- 11/29/2013; Phase I Dispositive Motion Hearing- 1/8/2014 at 9:30 AM in Ctrm. 9 (SAB); Further Case Management Conference- 1/22/2014 at 10:30 AM in Ctrm. 9 (SAB) (Joint Scheduling Report to be Filed One Week Prior); Jury Trial, 10 Day Est. - 10/6/2014 at 8:30 AM in Ctrm. 9 (SAB). (Arellano, S.)
August 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER ON STIPULATED Electronically Stored Information Protocol, Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/19/2013. (Arellano, S.)
July 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone on 7/2/2013. (Gaumnitz, R)
March 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER on 21 Bancinsure, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/26/2013. Plaintiff's Papers to Dismiss Claim or Amended Complaint due by 4/10/2013. Bancinsure's Answer to Complaint due by 4/25/2013. (Jessen, A)
February 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting 18 Stipulation to enlarge time for Bancinsure Inc to respond to complaint. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone on 2/19/2013. (Hernandez, M)
December 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER to Dismiss Defendant FDIC signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/07/2012. Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation terminated from action.(Flores, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hawker et al v. BancInsurance, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BancInsurance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas T. Hawker
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dave Kraechan
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John J. Incandela
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Jay Lee
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward J. Rocha
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?