Ransom v. Aguirre et al
Plaintiff: Bryan E. Ransom
Defendant: Rodolfo Aguirre, Emilio Alanis, E. Clark, Ray Cortez, Scott Kernan, Felipe Mariscal, Karla Messick, Jong Moon, Agustin Perez-Morales, Malkit Singh, Wayne Ulit, Ulysses Vallejo, Ronald Vogel, Jeffrey Wang and Bryan Wooden
Case Number: 1:2012cv01343
Filed: August 16, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Gerald B. Cohn
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 153 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS, Recommending That This Action Be Dismissed for Plaintiff's Failure to Comply With Court's Order 147 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 7/19/17: 14-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER Denying Defendants' 143 Motion to Vacate or Modify Discovery and Scheduling Order as Moot, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/21/17. (Gonzalez, R)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER Vacating 145 Findings and Recommendations Issued on May 4, 2017, and Granting Plaintiff Thirty Days in Which to Serve Initial Disclosures re 135 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/19/17. (Gonzalez, R)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 145 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that This Action be DISMISSED Based on Plaintiff's Failure to Obey the Court's Discovery and Scheduling Order of September 22, 2016 re 12 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/4/2017. Referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R due within fourteen (14) days. (Jessen, A)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to File Opposition or Statement of Non-Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Terminating Sanctions, within Twenty-One Days signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 04/13/2017. (Flores, E)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER ADOPTING 131 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and ORDER DISMISSING Certain Claims for Failure to Exhaust signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/26/2016. (Jessen, A)
March 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion to Place Court on Notice of Improper Conduct 119 ; FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS Following Evidentiary Hearing on Exhaustion of Administrative Remedies, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 3/11/16: 30-Day Objection Deadline. (Hellings, J)
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 120 Motion for Transcripts signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 01/21/2016. (Flores, E)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule for Remaining Exhaustion Issues; ORDER Denying Defendants' 117 Request for Additional Time as Moot signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 01/20/2016. (Flores, E)
December 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 112 NOTICE and ORDER that Bryan E. Ransom is no longer needed as a witness in these proceedings and the Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum is discharged signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 12/16/2015. (Lundstrom, T)
November 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER & WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum to Transport Bryan E. Ransom, CDCR #H-71641 on December 16, 2015 at 9:30 AM, Ctrm 6 (DLB), signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 11/18/15. (Hellings, J)
October 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 10/6/2015 setting Evidentiary Hearing for 12/16/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 before Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck. (Lundstrom, T).
September 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER Adopting Findings And Recommendations And Denying Defendants' Motion For Partial Summary Judgment Pending An Evidentiary Hearing (Documents 94 , 103 ), signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/30/2015. (Fahrney, E)
August 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 103 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 94 , signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 8/25/15: Matter referred to Judge Ishii; Thirty-Day Objection Deadline. (Hellings, J)
January 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER REGARDING Plaintiff's 92 Motion to Compel Defendant Kernan to Provide a Further Response to Request for Admission Number 6, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 1/27/15. (Marrujo, C)
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 87 Motion to Appoint Counsel and Motion for Appointment of Medical Expert, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 11/11/2014. (Marrujo, C)
November 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Request for Extension of Time re 85 & 86 ; ORDER REQUIRING Defendants Vogel and Perez to Provide Reponses; ORDER EXTENDING Date for Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 11/6/2014. (Marrujo, C)
September 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Request For Sanctions (Document 79 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 9/17/2014. (Fahrney, E)
May 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER REGARDING Defendants' 71 Request for Discovery; ORDER Opening Limited Discovery for Ninety Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 5/29/2014. (Marrujo, C)
April 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER Regarding Defendants' Status Report, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 4/10/14: Thirty-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER Requiring Defendants to File Status Report within Twenty-One Days,signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 03/14/2014. (21) Day Deadline (Martin-Gill, S)
March 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART 41 Motion to Dismiss ; ORDER ADOPTING 56 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, IN FULL, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 03/12/14. (Martin-Gill, S)
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER Adopting 59 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and DISMISSING Certain Defendants for Failure to Effectuate Service of Process signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/10/2014. Hubbard, Hugh, Lopez, Lovelady, Macias, Martines, Watkins, Weaver, Gibson and Hieng terminated. (Sant Agata, S)
November 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 59 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS DISMISSING CERTAIN DEFENDANTS FOR FAILURE TO EFFECTUATE SERVICE OF PROCESS signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 11/21/2013. Referred to Judge Anthony W Ishii; Objections to F&R due by 12/26/2013. (Lundstrom, T)
November 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Defendants' 49 Motion to Dismiss signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 10/31/2013. Referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Objections to F&R due by 12/5/2013. (Sant Agata, S)
October 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER DENYING 48 Motion to Amend the Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 10/17/2013. (Martin-Gill, S)
October 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 53 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction 49 , signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 10/3/13. Referred to Judge Ishii; 30-Day Deadline. (Verduzco, M)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE why Defendants should not be dismissed signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 8/26/2013. Show Cause Response due by 9/30/2013.(Lundstrom, T)
July 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 37 Motion for Relief from Judgment signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/31/2013. (Sant Agata, S)
May 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER DENYING 38 Plaintiff's Motion for United States Marshal to Serve Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 5/29/2013. (Jessen, A)
May 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER DIRECTING Served Defedants to File Responsive Pleading Within Thirty Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 5/17/2013. (Marrujo, C)
May 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Permanent Injunction 18 , signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/7/13. (Hellings, J)
March 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/19/2013 adopting 9 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; denying 6 Motion for TRO and denying 6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Lundstrom, T)
January 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that Plaintiff's 6 Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction be Denied signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 1/30/2013. Referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Objections to F&R due by 3/5/2013. (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ransom v. Aguirre et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan E. Ransom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodolfo Aguirre
Represented By: Scott William Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emilio Alanis
Represented By: Scott William Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Clark
Represented By: Scott William Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Cortez
Represented By: Scott William Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Kernan
Represented By: Scott William Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Felipe Mariscal
Represented By: Scott William Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karla Messick
Represented By: Scott William Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jong Moon
Represented By: Scott William Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agustin Perez-Morales
Represented By: Scott William Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malkit Singh
Represented By: Scott William Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Ulit
Represented By: Scott William Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ulysses Vallejo
Represented By: Scott William Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Vogel
Represented By: Scott William Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Wang
Represented By: Scott William Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Wooden
Represented By: Scott William Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?