Harrison v. Sedlezky et al
Plaintiff: James Harrison
Defendant: Sedlezky, Atkinson, Tallerico and A. Oddie
Case Number: 1:2012cv01400
Filed: August 27, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Gerald B. Cohn
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' Motion to Stay Responsive Pleading Deadline, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/2/2022. (Case Management Deadline: 30-Day Deadline)(Martin-Gill, S)
May 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE (Voluntary), signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 05/07/2016. CASE CLOSED(Martin-Gill, S)
April 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Directing Defendants to File an Opposition or Statement of Non-Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss the Action 49 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/26/16: 10-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER DISREGARDING Plaintiff's 36 Motion for Exhaustion AS UNNECESSARY, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/6/2015. (Martin-Gill, S)
June 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Granting 26 Defendant Atkinson's Request to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/3/15. Deadline: 7/2/2015 (Gonzalez, R)
January 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SCREENING Plaintiff's 11 First Amended Complaint and DISMISSING Claims without Leave to Amend signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/24/2014. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
October 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Dismissing Complaint With Leave to Amend, for Failure to State a Cognizable Claim, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/31/13. Thirty-Day Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harrison v. Sedlezky et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sedlezky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tallerico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Oddie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?